|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 13/01/1938 | 14/01/1938 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1939 | 08/07/1939 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2713 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/08/1941 | 23/09/1941 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2719 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 15/05/1944 | 24/06/1944 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 2591 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 01/09/1945 | 29/09/1945 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/01/1946 | 16/02/1946 | 43 days | Heavy | Boiler number 2253 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/05/1947 | 16/08/1947 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 2306 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 01/08/1951 | 27/08/1951 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 27588 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64929 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/12/1954 | 03/02/1955 | 43 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/01/1958 | 22/02/1958 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27637 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/08/1947 | Eastfield MPD | On 24/8 the locos. on shed ex works were 'J39' 4923/33; 'J83' 8445 and 'J69' 8623, and further locos. ex works during August that have been noted here are: 'K2' 1757; 'J37' 4541/79/84, 4604/17/21; 'J39' 4711, 4818, 4929; 'C15' 7468; 'J88' 8345; 'J83' 8473 (green); 'N15' 9136/77 an 9222. | SLS/194710 |
14/04/1963 | Eastfield MPD (waiting Works) | 61008 transferred from LMR, ex Works-65916/32, and waiting Works-44194, 45713/24, 57653, 61147/80/346, 64527, 64790/814/44/69/97/910/24/9, 90060 an 90759. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/04/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1587 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6826 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
25/05/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
13/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/01/1938. Dep: 14/01/1938. | ||
03/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1939. Dep: 08/07/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2713 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1941. Dep: 23/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2719 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
08/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
15/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1944. Dep: 24/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2591 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
01/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/09/1945. Dep: 29/09/1945. | ||
05/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 05/01/1946. Dep: 16/02/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2253 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4929 | ||
24/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1947. Dep: 16/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2306 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
22/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
01/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1951. Dep: 27/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27588 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64929 |
||
04/01/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
23/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/12/1954. Dep: 03/02/1955. | ||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Alnmouth (52d) | ||
17/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1958. Dep: 22/02/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27637 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64929 from Alnmouth (52D.1) | ||
05/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |