|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 27/01/1938 | 29/01/1938 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1938 | 11/03/1938 | 4 days | Light Repair | Cracked cylinder casting |
||
Darlington Works | 03/05/1939 | 17/06/1939 | 46 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 29/05/1942 | 02/07/1942 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 2936 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 01/11/1944 | 25/11/1944 | 25 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/06/1947 | 27/09/1947 | 110 days | General | Boiler number 4924 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 31/01/1950 | 25/02/1950 | 26 days | General | Renumbered to BR 64922 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 27/07/1952 | 22/08/1952 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 27522 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1954 | 19/05/1954 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/05/1955 | 29/06/1955 | 49 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/07/1958 | 23/08/1958 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 27499 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/08/1947 | Cowlairs Works | On 24/8 the following withdrawn locos. were in the Works yard: 'Dl' 2212, 'D29' 2415 and 'D31' 2068, the last two having been stripped; whilst those seen here newly painted were: 'D29' 2411 (green), 'J37' 4617 and 'J39' 4704. Locos. awaiting works, some of which had been stripped were: 'J39' 4711, 4817/40/49/65, 4919/22/28/42; 'K2' 1732/46/51/68/91; 'K3' 1879; 'D1' 2216; 'Dll' 2691; 'J38' 5909; 'J36' 5223/61; 'J35' 4503; 'J37' 4546/48/65/67, 4607/15; 'D31' 2059; 'D34' 2489; 'C15' 7453/65/66, 'N14' 9121; 'N15' 9191, 9214. The Erecting Shop was full and included: 'K2' 1720/34/52; 'K3' 1855; 'J39' 4912/16; 'J38' 5901/12; 'Dll' 2684/87 and 'Y9' 8120/22. | SLS/194710 |
07/09/1947 | Eastfield MPD | Nos. 4852 an 4927 (both BLA) were observed here on 7/9, awaiting shops. Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during September are: Nos. *1734/*1782, 1855, 2476/89, *2684/*2687, 2702, 4548, 4636, 4840/49, 4916/19/23/28, 5901/8/9/12, 7453/66, 7600, 8122, 8328, 8468/80, 9133, 9214/16 an 9564, whilst those observed on 1/10 were: *1732, 2455/73, 4578, 4865, 4922 an 9160 . *Painted green. On 11/10 'J83' No. 8474 was on shed, being ex Works and painted green. This engine now has a Gresham and Craven type 'P' solid jet ejector and an old (trigger) pattern steam brake valve. 'J37' No. 4546 has L.M.S. type water gauge frames with Dewrance protectors. | SLS/194711 |
31/12/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 61061, 1724, 61909/94, 62411/17/29/55, 2462/69, 62472, 2480, 62485/98, 62675, 2691, 63019/63, 3172, 64527, 4568/74/77, 4922, 5908, 8453, 8952, 68958, 9133, 69150, 9193, 69221, 9518/64, 73777, 77016, 79306, 90313. | SLS/195002 |
28/02/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 61002/64, 61350, 61742/43/57/58, 1760, 61792, 61851, 61996/98, 62215, 2431/89, 62719, 4556, 64589, 4597/99, 64613, 4922, 5903, 65926, 67455, 67605, 8956, 69139, 69203/08, 69500/96, ex-W.D. 73789. 90755/66. | SLS/195004 |
19/04/1954 | Wetherby Races, Easter Monday | Excursion trains between Leeds City and Wetherby Racecourse station on Easter Monday were well filled and worked by the following J39's from Neville Hill (50B):-64791, 64819/35/86, 64920/22/33/35/43, and also brought in D49 62748 (50B). The excursions from Bradford and Harrogate brought in 62746/58/62 (all 50D), whilst two trains from the Huddersfield area were worked by 45218 (25A) and 42863 (25B). The excursion from Heeley (Sheffield) was, however, worked by 45015 (3B-Bushbury), rather a far cry from Wolverhampton. In addition, the 4.28 p.m. ordinary passenger service from Leeds City to Church Fenton via Wetherby, hauled by 61256 (50B), called specially at Wetherby Racecourse station to pick up. | SLS/195406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/11/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1545 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6819 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
11/12/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
27/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/01/1938. Dep: 29/01/1938. | ||
08/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/03/1938. Dep: 11/03/1938. Work undertaken: Cracked cylinder casting |
||
03/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1939. Dep: 17/06/1939. | ||
29/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1942. Dep: 02/07/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2936 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
05/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
01/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1944. Dep: 25/11/1944. | ||
11/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4922 | ||
10/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1947. Dep: 27/09/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4924 (Diagram 97) |
||
31/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1950. Dep: 25/02/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64922 |
||
01/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
27/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1952. Dep: 22/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27522 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/05/1954. Dep: 19/05/1954. | ||
26/09/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
12/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/05/1955. Dep: 29/06/1955. | ||
26/06/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
10/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1958. Dep: 23/08/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27499 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64922 | ||
07/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |