|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 22/11/1937 | 23/11/1937 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 28/02/1938 | 19/03/1938 | 20 days | General | Cracked cylinder casting |
||
Darlington Works | 28/03/1940 | 24/04/1940 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 2938 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/05/1942 | 12/06/1942 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2154 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 15/05/1944 | 10/06/1944 | 27 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/08/1945 | 13/09/1945 | 43 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/01/1947 | 08/02/1947 | 22 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/03/1949 | 14/05/1949 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 27486 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64920 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 28/03/1952 | 26/04/1952 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/07/1953 | 16/07/1953 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/09/1954 | 01/11/1954 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 2601 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 30/09/1957 | 02/11/1957 | 34 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 30/05/1960 | 25/06/1960 | 27 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/04/1954 | Wetherby Races, Easter Monday | Excursion trains between Leeds City and Wetherby Racecourse station on Easter Monday were well filled and worked by the following J39's from Neville Hill (50B):-64791, 64819/35/86, 64920/22/33/35/43, and also brought in D49 62748 (50B). The excursions from Bradford and Harrogate brought in 62746/58/62 (all 50D), whilst two trains from the Huddersfield area were worked by 45218 (25A) and 42863 (25B). The excursion from Heeley (Sheffield) was, however, worked by 45015 (3B-Bushbury), rather a far cry from Wolverhampton. In addition, the 4.28 p.m. ordinary passenger service from Leeds City to Church Fenton via Wetherby, hauled by 61256 (50B), called specially at Wetherby Racecourse station to pick up. | SLS/195406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/06/1904 | Modification | Diagram 97 number 27483 boiler fitted | ||
10/06/1904 | Modification | Diagram 97 number C1799 boiler fitted | ||
04/11/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1543 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6817 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
30/11/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
22/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/11/1937. Dep: 23/11/1937. | ||
28/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1938. Dep: 19/03/1938. Work undertaken: Cracked cylinder casting |
||
28/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1940. Dep: 24/04/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2938 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1942. Dep: 12/06/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2154 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
16/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
15/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1944. Dep: 10/06/1944. | ||
02/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/08/1945. Dep: 13/09/1945. | ||
05/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4920 | ||
18/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1947. Dep: 08/02/1947. | ||
07/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
13/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
16/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1949. Dep: 14/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27486 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64920 |
||
12/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
18/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
28/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/03/1952. Dep: 26/04/1952. | ||
07/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/07/1953. Dep: 16/07/1953. | ||
23/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1954. Dep: 01/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2601 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 30/09/1957. Dep: 02/11/1957. | ||
30/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/05/1960. Dep: 25/06/1960. | ||
16/11/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64920 from Neville Hill (55H) | ||
06/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |