|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 15/09/1937 | 16/09/1937 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 22/03/1939 | 09/05/1939 | 49 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 05/06/1940 | 10/07/1940 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 03/11/1941 | 03/12/1941 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2939 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 01/07/1944 | 22/07/1944 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 2686 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/05/1947 | 06/09/1947 | 106 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/01/1950 | 11/02/1950 | 29 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64919 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 29/10/1952 | 21/11/1952 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 27559 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/09/1954 | 24/09/1954 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 14/03/1955 | 01/04/1955 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/05/1956 | 23/06/1956 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/06/1959 | 08/08/1959 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 27564 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/02/1960 | 26/03/1960 | 45 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/08/1947 | Cowlairs Works | On 24/8 the following withdrawn locos. were in the Works yard: 'Dl' 2212, 'D29' 2415 and 'D31' 2068, the last two having been stripped; whilst those seen here newly painted were: 'D29' 2411 (green), 'J37' 4617 and 'J39' 4704. Locos. awaiting works, some of which had been stripped were: 'J39' 4711, 4817/40/49/65, 4919/22/28/42; 'K2' 1732/46/51/68/91; 'K3' 1879; 'D1' 2216; 'Dll' 2691; 'J38' 5909; 'J36' 5223/61; 'J35' 4503; 'J37' 4546/48/65/67, 4607/15; 'D31' 2059; 'D34' 2489; 'C15' 7453/65/66, 'N14' 9121; 'N15' 9191, 9214. The Erecting Shop was full and included: 'K2' 1720/34/52; 'K3' 1855; 'J39' 4912/16; 'J38' 5901/12; 'Dll' 2684/87 and 'Y9' 8120/22. | SLS/194710 |
07/09/1947 | Eastfield MPD | Nos. 4852 an 4927 (both BLA) were observed here on 7/9, awaiting shops. Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during September are: Nos. *1734/*1782, 1855, 2476/89, *2684/*2687, 2702, 4548, 4636, 4840/49, 4916/19/23/28, 5901/8/9/12, 7453/66, 7600, 8122, 8328, 8468/80, 9133, 9214/16 an 9564, whilst those observed on 1/10 were: *1732, 2455/73, 4578, 4865, 4922 an 9160 . *Painted green. On 11/10 'J83' No. 8474 was on shed, being ex Works and painted green. This engine now has a Gresham and Craven type 'P' solid jet ejector and an old (trigger) pattern steam brake valve. 'J37' No. 4546 has L.M.S. type water gauge frames with Dewrance protectors. | SLS/194711 |
31/01/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 60152, 61072, 61117/18, 61307, 1751, 61764, 1780, 61784, 2474/76/88, 2684/94, 62733, 3058, 3168, 64575, 4586, 64621/28/36, 4786, 64877/80, 4919/40, 65923, 5924, 65932, 7453/80, 68100, 8323/44, 9170, 9214, 9507, 69595, 90505, ex-W.D. 77089, 77231, 73792. | SLS/195003 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/10/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1540 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6816 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
14/11/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
19/11/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
15/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/09/1937. Dep: 16/09/1937. | ||
22/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1939. Dep: 09/05/1939. | ||
05/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/06/1940. Dep: 10/07/1940. | ||
03/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1941. Dep: 03/12/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2939 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
01/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1944. Dep: 22/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2686 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4919 | ||
24/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1947. Dep: 06/09/1947. | ||
29/08/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
04/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
25/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA) | ||
01/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA) | ||
14/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/01/1950. Dep: 11/02/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64919 |
||
01/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
01/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
07/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
29/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1952. Dep: 21/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27559 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/02/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (54A) | ||
08/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/09/1954. Dep: 24/09/1954. | ||
14/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/03/1955. Dep: 01/04/1955. | ||
24/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/05/1956. Dep: 23/06/1956. | ||
25/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
05/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1959. Dep: 08/08/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27564 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/02/1960. Dep: 26/03/1960. | ||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64919 from Low Moor (56F) | ||
06/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |