|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 25/10/1937 | 27/10/1937 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 20/01/1939 | 25/02/1939 | 37 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 14/11/1940 | 12/12/1940 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2716 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 28/08/1943 | 18/09/1943 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 8592 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1946 | 07/06/1946 | 69 days | General | Boiler number 4913 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4918 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/09/1949 | 05/11/1949 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 4978 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64918 |
||
Gorton Works | 10/11/1949 | 12/11/1949 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Bow Works | 05/03/1952 | 14/03/1952 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 20/06/1953 | 15/08/1953 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 27766 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 18/08/1953 | 22/08/1953 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 28/07/1956 | 25/08/1956 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 27659 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/10/1960 | 22/12/1960 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 27796 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/12/1960 | Gorton Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Sidings: 40588, 43644, 47509, 63643/69, 63813, 64440, 68079, 90238/63/90, 90619. Old Iron Foundry: 62660, Scrap Yard: 42345. Erecting Shop: E26019/38, E27003, 63613/5/71, 63789/92, 63885/90, 64918, 90118/27/31/75, 90275, 90394, 90567/98, 92157. Erecting Shop Yard: E26041, 64379, 90002/36, 90362, 92151. Works Shunter: 43261. | SLS/196102 |
10/03/1963 | Ardsley MPD (Stored) | Stored at Ardsley on 10th March-60036/69/70/7/80/92/125, 61068/310, 64719/49/54/6/60/96/859/79/86/911/8/69, 67742/63/5/6/77. | SLS/196304 |
01/04/1963 | Washingborough Junction (Stored) | The Washingborough Junc.- Pelham St. Junc, section of the Boston-Lincoln line has been taken out of use; trains now use the former avoiding line from Washingborough Junc. (s.b. now closed) to Greetwell Junc. and the GN/GE Joint line thence to Lincoln Central. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/10/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1539 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6815 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
24/11/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
25/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/10/1937. Dep: 27/10/1937. | ||
20/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1939. Dep: 25/02/1939. | ||
14/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1940. Dep: 12/12/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2716 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
28/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1943. Dep: 18/09/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8592 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/06/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
31/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1946. Dep: 07/06/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4913 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4918 |
||
12/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1949. Dep: 05/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4978 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64918 |
||
10/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/11/1949. Dep: 12/11/1949. | ||
14/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) | ||
05/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Bow Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/03/1952. Dep: 14/03/1952. | ||
16/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
22/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
20/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1953. Dep: 15/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27766 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/08/1953. Dep: 22/08/1953. | ||
28/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1956. Dep: 25/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27659 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1960. Dep: 22/12/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27796 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64918 from Ardsley (56B) | ||
08/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |