|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 22/09/1937 | 23/09/1937 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/08/1938 | 29/09/1938 | 30 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/04/1941 | 29/05/1941 | 45 days | General | Boiler number BP133 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 08/01/1944 | 19/02/1944 | 43 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/01/1947 | 12/04/1947 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 27554 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/06/1948 | 16/07/1948 | 23 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 64915 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 08/06/1949 | 09/07/1949 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2685 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 01/08/1949 | 06/08/1949 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/01/1953 | 31/01/1953 | 24 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/08/1953 | 05/09/1953 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/01/1955 | 11/02/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 27526 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gateshead Works | 29/11/1955 | 07/12/1955 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 09/04/1957 | 07/05/1957 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/10/1958 | 15/11/1958 | 18 days | Light Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
09/07/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 1221, 61245, 61308, 1726/32, 61772/89, 61936, 2461/81/90, 2689, 62692, 63177, 4541, 64567, 4591, 64625, 4706, 64790, 4864, 64915, 5925/31, 67475/78, 8120, 8338/40, 68499, 8551, 9129/32, 69144, 9157/66/92, 70802, 77442, ex L.M.S. Nos. 45086, 7162, 54651. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. | SLS/194908 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/02/1904 | Modification | Diagram 97 number BP130 boiler fitted | ||
17/10/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1533 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6812 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
12/11/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
19/11/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
06/02/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
22/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/09/1937. Dep: 23/09/1937. | ||
31/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1938. Dep: 29/09/1938. | ||
15/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1941. Dep: 29/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number BP133 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
26/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
08/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1944. Dep: 19/02/1944. | ||
03/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4915 | ||
11/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1947. Dep: 12/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27554 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/06/1948. Dep: 16/07/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64915 |
||
07/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
13/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
08/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1949. Dep: 09/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2685 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/08/1949. Dep: 06/08/1949. | ||
08/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/01/1953. Dep: 31/01/1953. | ||
04/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/08/1953. Dep: 05/09/1953. | ||
14/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1955. Dep: 11/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27526 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/11/1955. Dep: 07/12/1955. | ||
09/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/04/1957. Dep: 07/05/1957. | ||
29/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 29/10/1958. Dep: 15/11/1958. | ||
29/03/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64915 from Heaton (52B) | ||
02/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |