|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 10/10/1937 | 19/10/1937 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 16/04/1939 | 27/05/1939 | 42 days | General | Boiler number E1352 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 14/11/1941 | 16/01/1942 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 2671 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/09/1944 | 11/11/1944 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 2310 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 18/05/1947 | 01/09/1947 | 107 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 22/11/1949 | 28/01/1950 | 68 days | General | Boiler number 8585 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64913 |
||
Gorton Works | 07/02/1950 | 09/02/1950 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 22/02/1953 | 18/04/1953 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 27746 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 11/08/1955 | 17/09/1955 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27740 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 14/06/1957 | 23/08/1957 | 71 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/10/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1870 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6810 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
12/11/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
10/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/10/1937. Dep: 19/10/1937. | ||
16/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1939. Dep: 27/05/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number E1352 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1941. Dep: 16/01/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2671 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1944. Dep: 11/11/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2310 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4913 | ||
11/12/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
18/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1947. Dep: 01/09/1947. | ||
22/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1949. Dep: 28/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8585 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64913 |
||
07/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/02/1950. Dep: 09/02/1950. | ||
22/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1953. Dep: 18/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27746 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1955. Dep: 17/09/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27740 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/04/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G) | ||
07/10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
06/01/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G) | ||
03/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
14/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/06/1957. Dep: 23/08/1957. | ||
21/10/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64913 from Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
11/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |