|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 07/07/1939 | 26/07/1939 | 20 days | General | Boiler number BP139 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 01/06/1943 | 05/08/1943 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 2595 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 22/10/1945 | 24/10/1945 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 12/08/1946 | 05/09/1946 | 25 days | Heavy | Boiler number 2691 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 05/07/1948 | 13/08/1948 | 40 days | General | Renumbered to BR 64912 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 21/06/1950 | 11/08/1950 | 52 days | General | Boiler number C2023 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 07/10/1952 | 26/10/1952 | 20 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/10/1953 | 24/11/1953 | 37 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/02/1955 | 11/03/1955 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 27486 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 12/12/1956 | 19/01/1957 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/05/1958 | 07/06/1958 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 27473 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 29/11/1959 | 30/11/1959 | 2 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/08/1947 | Cowlairs Works | On 24/8 the following withdrawn locos. were in the Works yard: 'Dl' 2212, 'D29' 2415 and 'D31' 2068, the last two having been stripped; whilst those seen here newly painted were: 'D29' 2411 (green), 'J37' 4617 and 'J39' 4704. Locos. awaiting works, some of which had been stripped were: 'J39' 4711, 4817/40/49/65, 4919/22/28/42; 'K2' 1732/46/51/68/91; 'K3' 1879; 'D1' 2216; 'Dll' 2691; 'J38' 5909; 'J36' 5223/61; 'J35' 4503; 'J37' 4546/48/65/67, 4607/15; 'D31' 2059; 'D34' 2489; 'C15' 7453/65/66, 'N14' 9121; 'N15' 9191, 9214. The Erecting Shop was full and included: 'K2' 1720/34/52; 'K3' 1855; 'J39' 4912/16; 'J38' 5901/12; 'Dll' 2684/87 and 'Y9' 8120/22. | SLS/194710 |
08/10/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted ready to leave Works were Nos. 60007, painted garter blue; 60516, green; 61120, black and lined, while 60877, 60961, 61804 an 63479 were plain black. Locomotives awaiting Works included:-Nos. 48, 1121 an 1902 while those under heavy repair included Nos. 8, 18, 19. 37, 78, 98, 513/19, 932/62, 1092, 1107/24, 1869, 2116, 7350 an 9999. Condemned locomotives on the dump were:-Nos. 2126/98 an 4107. Withdrawn 'C.1' Class Nos. 3274 an 3285, fitted with tall chimneys, extra- coal space, etc., were noted supplying steam to the Crimpsall Erecting Shop; it also appeared that Nos. 2821 (3293) and 4419 might also be similarly fitted and soon put to a similar use where required. It is understood that sixteen of the new 'A.1's' are to be built at Doncaster and twenty-three at Darlington. | SLS/194812 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/10/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1869 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6809 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
14/11/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
07/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1939. Dep: 26/07/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number BP139 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
01/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1943. Dep: 05/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2595 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/10/1945. Dep: 24/10/1945. | ||
17/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4912 | ||
12/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/08/1946. Dep: 05/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2691 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) | ||
24/03/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
05/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1948. Dep: 13/08/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64912 |
||
21/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1950. Dep: 11/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number C2023 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/10/1952. Dep: 26/10/1952. | ||
19/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 19/10/1953. Dep: 24/11/1953. | ||
14/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1955. Dep: 11/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27486 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/12/1956. Dep: 19/01/1957. | ||
09/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1958. Dep: 07/06/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27473 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/11/1959. Dep: 30/11/1959. | ||
12/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
05/12/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64912 from Carlisle Canal (12C) |