|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 01/09/1938 | 22/09/1938 | 22 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 31/08/1940 | 14/09/1940 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 4915 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/02/1943 | 25/02/1943 | 9 days | General | Boiler number 4908 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/10/1944 | 26/10/1944 | 9 days | General | Boiler number 3197 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/06/1947 | 23/07/1947 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2301 (Diagram 97) |
||
Derby Works | 30/11/1950 | 08/02/1951 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 27652 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64910 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 21/05/1954 | 24/06/1954 | 35 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/07/1956 | 22/09/1956 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 27550 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/12/1959 | 29/01/1960 | 31 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1951 | Derby Works | During the second half of January new construction comprised some work on Nos. 73000/1, the cylinders of the former being positioned. No. 10100 has been outside the diesel shop for some days. Condemned locos. in the Works yard: 40370, 41012, 41824 (from W.R.), also the N.L. Crane 58865. No. 22853 was still in Works, not cut up, on 26/1. In store near the station: 43429 (17C), and 407, 40418, 40513, 40632, 43200/59, 43361 (17A), all 17A. Engines from other Regions under repair: 42328, 42506/23, 58043 (33A), 42394 (87K), 44518 (35C), 64728 (40A), 64751, 64911 (37A), 64987 (36C). Most engines now leave shops with the B.R. emblem, but 42371 an 47473 have come off lettered BRITISH RAILWAYS, while tenders so lettered are attached to 43757, 44576 an 58265. Engines off shops with tanks or tenders lettered L.M.S. are 42335, 41101, 43395, 44002/15: apparently Derby has a lingering affection for this lettering, which became obsolete three years ago!! W2043 has come off without emblem, but with W prefix under the numberplate. No. 58071, lined with emblem, is freshly out still with round-topped firebox. Several J.39 class have come off shops, 64793, 64910/79 (repainted with emblem) and 64714 (renumbered-with emblem-but not repainted). Un-renumbered engines in shops include 326 (20A), 580 (27D), 7295 (12A), 7339 (11A), 7391 (12A). No. 326 is the last of the S. & D.J. engines to get its B.R. number, which will be its fourth: originally No. 69, it became 43 in 1928, and 326 in March 1930. Latterly it has been working in the Leeds area. | SLS/195103 |
28/02/1951 | Derby Works | During February, un-renumbered engines in Works were 7665 (5C), 7453 (10E), 762 (15D), 4409 (17A), 7125 (18A), 3334 (19A), 3449 (20B), 3656 (20D), 3257, 4203/24 (21A), 7567 (25G). Engines received from other regions for attention were (30A) 64781, (32A) 64731, (32B) 64900, (33C) 42505/11, (35C) 44476, (37A) 64760, 64840, (E) 4907, (38A) 64716, 64965, (40A) 64725, 64886, (71G) 44560, (71H) 43194, (84J) 2183, (85B) 2144, (86B) 2033. Engines despatched to other regions after repair include (30A) 64783, (32A) 64802, (32B) 64905, (33A) 42328, (33C) 42506, (35C) 40482, 44518, (36A) 64910/67, (37A) 64751, 64836, 64911, (38A) 64832, (40A) 64730, (71G) 44560, (84G) 43679, (87K) 42385. No. 58246 (LMS.3175) has come off works still with round-topped fire-box. The following withdrawn engines were cut up in February: 22853, 41012, 41962, 762, 41824, 43811; while Nos. 41011, 41955/60/3-5/8 and Crane 58865 were in the yard. Stored, near station: 40411/6, 40632, 41000/60, 43200/59, 43361/70, 43429. No. 43226 is in for special examination, and may be condemned. At the end of the month, Nos. 407, 40418 an 40513, which have been in store for some time near the station, were returned to traffic. |
SLS/195104 |
14/04/1963 | Eastfield MPD (waiting Works) | 61008 transferred from LMR, ex Works-65916/32, and waiting Works-44194, 45713/24, 57653, 61147/80/346, 64527, 64790/814/44/69/97/910/24/9, 90060 an 90759. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/09/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1856 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6807 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
24/10/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
01/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1938. Dep: 22/09/1938. | ||
31/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1940. Dep: 14/09/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4915 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1943. Dep: 25/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4908 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1944. Dep: 26/10/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3197 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4910 | ||
23/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
30/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1947. Dep: 23/07/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2301 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1950. Dep: 08/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27652 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64910 |
||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
18/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
24/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
14/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
21/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/05/1954. Dep: 24/06/1954. | ||
19/09/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northallerton (51J) | ||
06/03/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
25/09/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (54A) | ||
10/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
26/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1956. Dep: 22/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27550 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/05/1959 | Modification | Diagram 97 number 25804 boiler fitted | ||
30/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/12/1959. Dep: 29/01/1960. | ||
11/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) | ||
15/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
19/08/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Alnmouth (52d) | ||
23/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64910 from Alnmouth (52D.1) | ||
05/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |