|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 15/09/1937 | 16/09/1937 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/09/1938 | 05/11/1938 | 46 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 29/01/1941 | 22/03/1941 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 2945 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 14/03/1943 | 11/07/1943 | 120 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 12/06/1945 | 25/08/1945 | 75 days | Heavy | Boiler number 27706 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/02/1947 | 01/04/1947 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 10/08/1948 | 22/10/1948 | 74 days | General | Boiler number 4937 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64909 |
||
Derby Works | 28/02/1951 | 03/04/1951 | 35 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Stratford Works | 26/05/1953 | 25/07/1953 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 27787 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/10/1956 | 26/01/1957 | 110 days | General | Boiler number 25806 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/01/1957 | 16/02/1957 | 17 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/03/1951 | Derby Works | Early March-Un-renumbered engines entering works were 1396 (19B), 3186 (21C), 3991 (17B), 7334 (20D), 7346 (9B), 7508 (25E), 7605 (11A). For special examination 43232 (15C). From other regions 42507/24 (33A), 64713 an 64909 (36A), 64828 (38A). New construction: 73000 had boiler on 9/3, 73002/3 an 12088/9 were frames only. Additional stored engines are 404 an 43496. Engines from other regions, repainted with emblem-2183, 64907/87. Off Works lettered L.M.S.-10000, 40430, 43995/7. | SLS/195108 |
14/03/1951 | Derby Works | Early March-Un-renumbered engines entering works were 1396 (19B), 3186 (21C), 3991 (17B), 7334 (20D), 7346 (9B), 7508 (25E), 7605 (11A). For special examination 43232 (15C). From other regions 42507/24 (33A), 64713 an 64909 (36A), 64828 (38A). New construction: 73000 had boiler on 9/3: 73002/3 an 12088/9 were frames only. Additional stored engines are 404 an 43496. Engines from other regions, repainted with emblem-2183, 64907/87. Off Works lettered L.M.S.-10000, 40430, 43995/7. | SLS/195104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
25/09/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1854 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6806 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
14/11/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
15/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/09/1937. Dep: 16/09/1937. | ||
21/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1938. Dep: 05/11/1938. | ||
29/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1941. Dep: 22/03/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2945 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1943. Dep: 11/07/1943. | ||
12/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/06/1945. Dep: 25/08/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27706 (Diagram 97) |
||
31/03/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
28/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
18/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4909 | ||
22/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
18/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1947. Dep: 01/04/1947. | ||
10/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1948. Dep: 22/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4937 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64909 |
||
28/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 28/02/1951. Dep: 03/04/1951. | ||
26/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1953. Dep: 25/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27787 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1956. Dep: 26/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 25806 (Diagram 97) |
||
31/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/01/1957. Dep: 16/02/1957. | ||
04/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
05/04/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64909 from Doncaster (36A) |