|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 23/08/1937 | 03/09/1937 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/09/1938 | 22/10/1938 | 35 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 11/07/1940 | 17/08/1940 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 4908 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/12/1942 | 13/02/1943 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 27706 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/03/1943 | 17/03/1943 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 16/04/1945 | 21/07/1945 | 97 days | General | Boiler number E1350 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/08/1945 | 18/08/1945 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 14/04/1946 | 10/08/1946 | 119 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 10/06/1948 | 07/08/1948 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 4940 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64908 |
||
Derby Works | 03/08/1951 | 15/09/1951 | 44 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Stratford Works | 26/05/1954 | 26/06/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 27888 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/02/1957 | 23/03/1957 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 25838 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/09/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1828 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6805 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
23/10/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
23/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/08/1937. Dep: 03/09/1937. | ||
18/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1938. Dep: 22/10/1938. | ||
11/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1940. Dep: 17/08/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4908 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1942. Dep: 13/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27706 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/03/1943. Dep: 17/03/1943. | ||
16/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1945. Dep: 21/07/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number E1350 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/08/1945. Dep: 18/08/1945. | ||
24/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4908 | ||
14/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1946. Dep: 10/08/1946. | ||
23/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
10/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1948. Dep: 07/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4940 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64908 |
||
03/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/08/1951. Dep: 15/09/1951. | ||
26/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1954. Dep: 26/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27888 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1957. Dep: 23/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 25838 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/03/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64908 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
04/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |