|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 27/05/1939 | 01/07/1939 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2104 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 27/04/1942 | 06/06/1942 | 41 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 08/06/1942 | 20/06/1942 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 10/09/1945 | 20/10/1945 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 8024 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 09/03/1948 | 01/04/1948 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 27479 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64899 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 30/03/1950 | 22/04/1950 | 24 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/10/1951 | 05/11/1951 | 25 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/05/1953 | 24/05/1953 | 21 days | General | Boiler number 27545 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 22/06/1954 | 10/07/1954 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/09/1954 | 07/10/1954 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/04/1956 | 12/05/1956 | 40 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/05/1956 | 30/05/1956 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/04/1957 | 20/04/1957 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/03/1958 | 03/04/1958 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/01/1959 | 05/02/1959 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 27416 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 60529, 61103/72, 61738/68, 61854, 61909/83, 62423, 2430, 62436, 2475, 62479, 3143, 4544, 64593, 64849/54, 4865/68, 64899, 4917, 65921, 7469, 8458, 8550, 9151/62, 69174, 9182, 69553, 90071, 90306, ex-L.M.S. 2835, 42909/18, ex-W.D. 77087, 77107, 77302/99. | SLS/195006 |
17/03/1963 | Carlisle Canal MPD (Stored) | Stored at Carlisle Canal-42067/98, 42449, 42720/52/5, 42835/6, 43045/139, 47520, 61064, 64499, 64877/8/95/9, 65237 an 69155. | SLS/196304 |
29/04/1963 | Coventry (Stored) | On 29th April a Cathedral special from Newcastle was worked throughout by Peak D192 (52A) instead of the usual V2; three of latter class failed on similar specials during April. On lst May, 70035 (40B) worked a special evening coke train from Coventry Gas Works to Immingham. Commencing April, a twice weekly car train is scheduled to run between the new Rootes factory at Linwood and the Rootes factory at Coventry; the trains run to Gosford Green goods station (Coventry avoiding line) arriving at 3-45 a.m. and are worked throughout by two Polmadie Type 1 d/es which then run to Rugby, l.e., and return from Gosford Green at 5 p.m. Since running, D8119-8128 have all been noted on this turn. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/08/1936 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2995 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1672 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
21/01/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
27/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1939. Dep: 01/07/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2104 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1942. Dep: 06/06/1942. | ||
08/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/06/1942. Dep: 20/06/1942. | ||
10/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1945. Dep: 20/10/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8024 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4899 | ||
15/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
09/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1948. Dep: 01/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27479 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64899 |
||
30/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/03/1950. Dep: 22/04/1950. | ||
12/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/10/1951. Dep: 05/11/1951. | ||
04/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1953. Dep: 24/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27545 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/06/1954. Dep: 10/07/1954. | ||
14/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/09/1954. Dep: 07/10/1954. | ||
03/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/04/1956. Dep: 12/05/1956. | ||
28/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/05/1956. Dep: 30/05/1956. | ||
08/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/04/1957. Dep: 20/04/1957. | ||
21/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/03/1958. Dep: 03/04/1958. | ||
15/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1959. Dep: 05/02/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27416 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64899 from Carlisle Canal (12C) | ||
05/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |