|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 04/07/1938 | 23/07/1938 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 2704 (Diagram 97) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/06/1941 | 19/07/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 14/11/1942 | 1 day | Heavy | ||||
Stratford Works | 02/01/1943 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Stratford Works | 05/05/1944 | 27/05/1944 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 2663 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 27/01/1945 | 01/02/1945 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 17/03/1945 | 14/04/1945 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 16/02/1946 | 23/02/1946 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/05/1947 | 13/06/1947 | 36 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/12/1947 | 13/03/1948 | 85 days | Heavy | Boiler number 3802 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 21/03/1950 | 07/04/1950 | 18 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/05/1952 | 02/06/1952 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 27517 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 11/06/1954 | 12/07/1954 | 32 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/08/1954 | 14/08/1954 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/04/1957 | 25/06/1957 | 67 days | General | Boiler number 27514 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 11/09/1959 | 03/10/1959 | 23 days | Light Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
17/03/1963 | Carlisle Canal MPD (Stored) | Stored at Carlisle Canal-42067/98, 42449, 42720/52/5, 42835/6, 43045/139, 47520, 61064, 64499, 64877/8/95/9, 65237 an 69155. | SLS/196304 |
29/04/1963 | Coventry (Stored) | On 29th April a Cathedral special from Newcastle was worked throughout by Peak D192 (52A) instead of the usual V2; three of latter class failed on similar specials during April. On lst May, 70035 (40B) worked a special evening coke train from Coventry Gas Works to Immingham. Commencing April, a twice weekly car train is scheduled to run between the new Rootes factory at Linwood and the Rootes factory at Coventry; the trains run to Gosford Green goods station (Coventry avoiding line) arriving at 3-45 a.m. and are worked throughout by two Polmadie Type 1 d/es which then run to Rugby, l.e., and return from Gosford Green at 5 p.m. Since running, D8119-8128 have all been noted on this turn. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/10/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2991 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1642 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
28/10/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
04/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1938. Dep: 23/07/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2704 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/09/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
14/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1941. Dep: 19/07/1941. | ||
14/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy) - Arr: 14/11/1942. | ||
02/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/01/1943. | ||
05/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1944. Dep: 27/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2663 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/01/1945. Dep: 01/02/1945. | ||
17/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/03/1945. Dep: 14/04/1945. | ||
28/01/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
16/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/02/1946. Dep: 23/02/1946. | ||
17/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) | ||
29/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
22/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4895 | ||
28/03/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
09/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1947. Dep: 13/06/1947. | ||
20/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 20/12/1947. Dep: 13/03/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3802 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/09/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 64895 | ||
21/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1950. Dep: 07/04/1950. | ||
02/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1952. Dep: 02/06/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27517 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/06/1954. Dep: 12/07/1954. | ||
02/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/08/1954. Dep: 14/08/1954. | ||
20/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1957. Dep: 25/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27514 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 11/09/1959. Dep: 03/10/1959. | ||
27/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64895 from Carlisle Canal (12C) | ||
06/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |