|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 03/10/1937 | 06/11/1937 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 2675 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/05/1940 | 08/06/1940 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 2641 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 28/03/1943 | 14/08/1943 | 140 days | General | Boiler number 8003 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 17/04/1946 | 22/07/1946 | 97 days | General | Boiler number 2595 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 13/11/1947 | 24/12/1947 | 42 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 06/01/1948 | 24/02/1948 | 50 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 20/02/1949 | 09/04/1949 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 4969 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64889 |
||
Derby Works | 22/11/1951 | 07/01/1952 | 47 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Stratford Works | 27/03/1954 | 30/04/1954 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 27885 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 23/09/1956 | 07/11/1956 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 27650 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 06/01/1958 | 21/03/1958 | 75 days | Heavy Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
12/02/1948 | Stratford Works | The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 | SLS/194803 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/09/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2985 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1636 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
14/10/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
03/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1937. Dep: 06/11/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2675 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1940. Dep: 08/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2641 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1943. Dep: 14/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8003 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
17/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1946. Dep: 22/07/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2595 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) | ||
01/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4889 | ||
26/03/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
13/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/11/1947. Dep: 24/12/1947. | ||
06/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/01/1948. Dep: 24/02/1948. | ||
20/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1949. Dep: 09/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4969 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64889 |
||
22/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/11/1951. Dep: 07/01/1952. | ||
27/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1954. Dep: 30/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27885 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1956. Dep: 07/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27650 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 06/01/1958. Dep: 21/03/1958. | ||
21/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
08/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
20/08/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64889 from Colwick (40E) | ||
09/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |