|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 15/11/1937 | 18/12/1937 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2696 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/07/1940 | 28/09/1940 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 2686 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 28/03/1943 | 04/07/1943 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 2294 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 24/03/1946 | 20/07/1946 | 119 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 12/06/1947 | 10/08/1947 | 60 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 25/07/1948 | 15/09/1948 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 8586 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64879 |
||
Derby Works | 21/04/1951 | 14/06/1951 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 27667 (Diagram 97) |
||
Derby Works | 22/08/1952 | 09/10/1952 | 49 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Derby Works | 12/10/1952 | 14/10/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 23/12/1954 | 15/01/1955 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 18/01/1955 | 20/01/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1955 | 19/11/1955 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 27798 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/11/1955 | 25/11/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 03/03/1959 | 15/04/1959 | 44 days | Heavy Intermediate | A.W.S. part fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/03/1963 | Ardsley MPD (Stored) | Stored at Ardsley on 10th March-60036/69/70/7/80/92/125, 61068/310, 64719/49/54/6/60/96/859/79/86/911/8/69, 67742/63/5/6/77. | SLS/196304 |
01/04/1963 | Washingborough Junction (Stored) | The Washingborough Junc.- Pelham St. Junc, section of the Boston-Lincoln line has been taken out of use; trains now use the former avoiding line from Washingborough Junc. (s.b. now closed) to Greetwell Junc. and the GN/GE Joint line thence to Lincoln Central. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/07/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2948 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1624 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
09/08/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
15/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1937. Dep: 18/12/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2696 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1940. Dep: 28/09/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2686 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1943. Dep: 04/07/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2294 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/05/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
24/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1946. Dep: 20/07/1946. | ||
24/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
03/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4879 | ||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
12/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/06/1947. Dep: 10/08/1947. | ||
25/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1948. Dep: 15/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8586 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64879 |
||
12/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV) | ||
14/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
08/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
14/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
21/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1951. Dep: 14/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27667 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
22/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/08/1952. Dep: 09/10/1952. | ||
12/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/10/1952. Dep: 14/10/1952. | ||
23/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/12/1954. Dep: 15/01/1955. | ||
18/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/01/1955. Dep: 20/01/1955. | ||
22/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1955. Dep: 19/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27798 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/11/1955. Dep: 25/11/1955. | ||
03/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/03/1959. Dep: 15/04/1959. Work undertaken: A.W.S. part fitted |
||
13/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64879 from Ardsley (56B) | ||
09/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |