|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 20/02/1938 | 08/04/1938 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 2695 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/04/1938 | 05/05/1938 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 07/01/1941 | 08/02/1941 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 2145 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/04/1943 | 30/08/1943 | 133 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 17/06/1945 | 22/08/1945 | 67 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 19/05/1946 | 31/07/1946 | 74 days | Heavy | Boiler number E1355 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4876 |
||
Gorton Works | 16/10/1949 | 31/12/1949 | 77 days | General | Boiler number 2116 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64876 |
||
Gorton Works | 06/01/1950 | 07/01/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 15/02/1952 | 20/03/1952 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 27431 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 21/09/1953 | 10/10/1953 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 13/04/1955 | 27/05/1955 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 27715 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/02/1957 | 09/03/1957 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 12/03/1957 | 13/03/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | Not repaired |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/01/1959 | Doncaster MPD (Stored) | On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). | SLS/195902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
21/06/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2945 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1621 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
09/08/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
19/08/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
29/08/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
20/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1938. Dep: 08/04/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2695 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/04/1938. Dep: 05/05/1938. | ||
07/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1941. Dep: 08/02/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2145 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1943. Dep: 30/08/1943. | ||
17/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1945. Dep: 22/08/1945. | ||
19/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy) - Arr: 19/05/1946. Dep: 31/07/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number E1355 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4876 |
||
16/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1949. Dep: 31/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2116 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64876 |
||
06/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/01/1950. Dep: 07/01/1950. | ||
24/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
30/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
15/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1952. Dep: 20/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27431 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
21/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/09/1953. Dep: 10/10/1953. | ||
13/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1955. Dep: 27/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27715 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/11/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
20/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/02/1957. Dep: 09/03/1957. | ||
12/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/03/1957. Dep: 13/03/1957. Work undertaken: Not repaired |
||
28/09/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64876 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
10/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |