|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 18/11/1937 | 24/12/1937 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 2681 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/01/1938 | 06/01/1938 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 29/06/1940 | 10/08/1940 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2665 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 27/02/1943 | 07/08/1943 | 162 days | General | Boiler number 1921 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 16/12/1945 | 19/01/1946 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 3175 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/09/1948 | 13/11/1948 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 2294 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64873 |
||
Derby Works | 20/12/1951 | 08/02/1952 | 51 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Stratford Works | 22/07/1953 | 15/08/1953 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 22/01/1954 | 06/02/1954 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 28/02/1955 | 14/04/1955 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 27806 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 22/07/1955 | 06/08/1955 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 23/07/1957 | 30/08/1957 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2623 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/06/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2942 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1618 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
09/08/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
22/08/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
28/08/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
18/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1937. Dep: 24/12/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2681 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/01/1938. Dep: 06/01/1938. | ||
29/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1940. Dep: 10/08/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2665 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1943. Dep: 07/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1921 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/06/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
23/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
16/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1945. Dep: 19/01/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3175 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4873 | ||
19/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1948. Dep: 13/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2294 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64873 |
||
16/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
22/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
20/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/12/1951. Dep: 08/02/1952. | ||
22/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/07/1953. Dep: 15/08/1953. | ||
22/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/01/1954. Dep: 06/02/1954. | ||
28/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1955. Dep: 14/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27806 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/07/1955. Dep: 06/08/1955. | ||
28/10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
14/04/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
23/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1957. Dep: 30/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2623 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
18/05/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64873 from Stratford (30A) |