|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 14/07/1936 | 27/08/1936 | 45 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 02/12/1937 | 28/01/1938 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 27479 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/03/1940 | 19/04/1940 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2622 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/08/1942 | 18/09/1942 | 39 days | General | Boiler number RS119 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/06/1943 | 16/07/1943 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/09/1944 | 07/10/1944 | 32 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 08/01/1946 | 1 day | W | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 08/03/1947 | 10/05/1947 | 64 days | General | Boiler number BP138 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 16/04/1950 | 13/05/1950 | 28 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64868 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 16/02/1952 | 21/03/1952 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 27484 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 19/09/1955 | 19/10/1955 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/12/1955 | 17/12/1955 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/06/1956 | 07/07/1956 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/10/1958 | 08/11/1958 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 27519 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 60529, 61103/72, 61738/68, 61854, 61909/83, 62423, 2430, 62436, 2475, 62479, 3143, 4544, 64593, 64849/54, 4865/68, 64899, 4917, 65921, 7469, 8458, 8550, 9151/62, 69174, 9182, 69553, 90071, 90306, ex-L.M.S. 2835, 42909/18, ex-W.D. 77087, 77107, 77302/99. | SLS/195006 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/12/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1504 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1654 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
14/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/07/1936. Dep: 27/08/1936. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
02/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1937. Dep: 28/01/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27479 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1940. Dep: 19/04/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2622 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1942. Dep: 18/09/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number RS119 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
24/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/06/1943. Dep: 16/07/1943. | ||
06/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1944. Dep: 07/10/1944. | ||
08/01/1946 | Works Visit | |||
12/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4868 | ||
08/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1947. Dep: 10/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number BP138 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Alnmouth (Twd) | ||
17/04/1948 | Allocation | |||
18/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
16/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Alnmouth (Twd) | ||
22/05/1948 | Allocation | |||
16/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/04/1950. Dep: 13/05/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64868 |
||
16/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1952. Dep: 21/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27484 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/09/1955. Dep: 19/10/1955. | ||
01/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/12/1955. Dep: 17/12/1955. | ||
28/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/06/1956. Dep: 07/07/1956. | ||
17/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1958. Dep: 08/11/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27519 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/04/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64868 from Alnmouth (52D.1) | ||
10/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |