|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 16/08/1938 | 17/09/1938 | 33 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/12/1940 | 15/01/1941 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2714 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/10/1943 | 06/11/1943 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 3173 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 17/11/1943 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 11/01/1944 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 02/06/1945 | 14/07/1945 | 43 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/07/1946 | 31/08/1946 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 27553 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4860 |
||
Darlington Works | 13/09/1946 | 11/10/1946 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 06/12/1947 | 07/01/1948 | 33 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/07/1948 | 21/08/1948 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 27482 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64860 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 10/01/1951 | 03/02/1951 | 25 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/01/1952 | 23/02/1952 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/05/1953 | 11/07/1953 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 2253 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 03/07/1956 | 23/08/1956 | 52 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/04/1957 | 04/05/1957 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/11/1958 | 06/12/1958 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 27567 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/02/1948 | Darlington Works | On 7/2 new 'L.1's' up to No. 9006 were complete and painted in North Road yard, Nos. 9001/2 are Darlington 2020/1 of 1948. Nos. 9001-3 are painted green and lettered L.N.E.R., while 9004 and upwards have 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and the numbers on the bunkers; it is understood that they will be fitted with electric light and Westinghouse brakes. Nos. 9001/2 are at present working from Darlington on Saltburn turns. 'B.1' No. 1062 has been painted green and it is understood that 'B.1's' as they come in for shops will be dealt with in a similar manner. Locomotives awaiting Shops or scrapping during January included: 819, 958, 1881, 2111/2, 2361, 2713/8, 2939/41, 3124, 3252, 3339, 3404, 4756, 4860, 5030/44/98, 5639/45/46, 5769, 5804/31/49/78, 7266/74, 7608/43, 8308, 8402, 8725/27, 9379/86, 9422, 9775 an 9835, and Rail Cars Recovery and Hope. Locomotives ex Shops included: Nos. 1068, 1466, 2354/60/74/95, 3408/39/60, 5037, 5705/13/36/73, 7309/21, 7625/57, 8230/98, 8304, 8702/48, 9117, 9431, 9778/95/99, 9835/39/41/79/86/90. It is believed that the first two locomotives to be painted here with the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to have the number prefixed with an 'E' were Nos. E5696 and E5663, during W/E 31/1; all locomotives off North Road are now appearing in a similar manner. 'B.1's' Nos. 1273-6 have arrived at Bank Top shed, the first lot of a further ten to be allocated here; these will replace 'J.39's' which are going elsewhere | SLS/194803 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/10/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1436 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1646 Allocated to Neville Hill (NEV) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
16/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1938. Dep: 17/09/1938. | ||
13/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1940. Dep: 15/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2714 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
20/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1943. Dep: 06/11/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3173 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/11/1943. | ||
11/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/01/1944. | ||
02/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/06/1945. Dep: 14/07/1945. | ||
06/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1946. Dep: 31/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27553 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4860 |
||
13/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/09/1946. Dep: 11/10/1946. | ||
06/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/12/1947. Dep: 07/01/1948. | ||
26/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1948. Dep: 21/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27482 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64860 |
||
10/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/01/1951. Dep: 03/02/1951. | ||
19/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/01/1952. Dep: 23/02/1952. | ||
28/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1953. Dep: 11/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2253 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
07/08/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
03/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 03/07/1956. Dep: 23/08/1956. | ||
04/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/04/1957. Dep: 04/05/1957. | ||
11/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1958. Dep: 06/12/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27567 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/08/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64860 from Gateshead (52A) | ||
08/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |