|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 21/08/1936 | 30/09/1936 | 41 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/03/1939 | 22/04/1939 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 2591 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/04/1940 | 27/05/1940 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1941 | 21/06/1941 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 2564 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/03/1942 | 23/05/1942 | 58 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/04/1944 | 13/05/1944 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2636 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 18/01/1947 | 08/03/1947 | 50 days | General | Boiler number C1713 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 27/05/1949 | 25/06/1949 | 30 days | Light Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64858 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 26/10/1951 | 17/11/1951 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 27592 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 19/12/1953 | 30/01/1954 | 43 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/09/1956 | 27/10/1956 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27580 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 22/07/1960 | 17/09/1960 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 27711 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/11/1961 | 02/12/1961 | 10 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
05/06/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 60503/06, 61002, 1260/1/2, 1742/66/93, 61998, 2402/40/60, 4594, 4617/26, 4818/58, 65933, 7480/91, 67631, 8104, 9209, 69500/10, 9553, 69565, Class '8' 73799, 77031, 77431/42/76, ex L.M.S. Nos. 44994, 16156. | SLS/194907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
14/11/1934 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1478 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1602 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
21/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1936. Dep: 30/09/1936. | ||
02/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1939. Dep: 22/04/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2591 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/04/1940. Dep: 27/05/1940. | ||
20/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1941. Dep: 21/06/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2564 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/03/1942. Dep: 23/05/1942. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
14/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1944. Dep: 13/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2636 (Diagram 97) |
||
31/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4858 | ||
18/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1947. Dep: 08/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1713 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/08/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
04/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
27/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 27/05/1949. Dep: 25/06/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64858 |
||
04/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
10/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
02/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
08/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
26/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1951. Dep: 17/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27592 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 19/12/1953. Dep: 30/01/1954. | ||
20/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1956. Dep: 27/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27580 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1960. Dep: 17/09/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27711 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
23/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/11/1961. Dep: 02/12/1961. | ||
29/03/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64858 from Sunderland (52G) | ||
03/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |