|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 15/02/1937 | 17/03/1937 | 31 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 19/03/1937 | 01/04/1937 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/04/1939 | 12/06/1939 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1913 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/05/1941 | 12/07/1941 | 60 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 18/07/1941 | 14/08/1941 | 28 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 10/07/1942 | 20/08/1942 | 42 days | Unclassified | Tender only |
||
Darlington Works | 30/06/1943 | 09/08/1943 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27482 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 21/04/1945 | 19/05/1945 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2712 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 05/10/1946 | 19/10/1946 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/01/1948 | 20/03/1948 | 67 days | General | Boiler number E1353 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64854 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 18/04/1950 | 06/05/1950 | 19 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/05/1951 | 04/05/1951 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 23/06/1953 | 08/08/1953 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 27767 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 27/01/1959 | 14/02/1959 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 27429 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/04/1959 | 06/05/1959 | 14 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 60529, 61103/72, 61738/68, 61854, 61909/83, 62423, 2430, 62436, 2475, 62479, 3143, 4544, 64593, 64849/54, 4865/68, 64899, 4917, 65921, 7469, 8458, 8550, 9151/62, 69174, 9182, 69553, 90071, 90306, ex-L.M.S. 2835, 42909/18, ex-W.D. 77087, 77107, 77302/99. | SLS/195006 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/12/1934 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1490 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1608 Allocated to Ferryhill (Co. Durham) (FER) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
15/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1937. Dep: 17/03/1937. | ||
19/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/03/1937. Dep: 01/04/1937. | ||
07/11/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
24/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1939. Dep: 12/06/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1913 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/07/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
14/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1941. Dep: 12/07/1941. | ||
18/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/07/1941. Dep: 14/08/1941. | ||
10/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/07/1942. Dep: 20/08/1942. Work undertaken: Tender only |
||
21/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
30/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1943. Dep: 09/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27482 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1945. Dep: 19/05/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2712 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/10/1946. Dep: 19/10/1946. | ||
01/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4854 | ||
14/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1948. Dep: 20/03/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number E1353 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64854 |
||
17/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
23/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
18/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 18/04/1950. Dep: 06/05/1950. | ||
01/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/05/1951. Dep: 04/05/1951. | ||
04/01/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
23/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1953. Dep: 08/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27767 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1959. Dep: 14/02/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27429 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/04/1959. Dep: 06/05/1959. | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
11/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64854 from Sunderland (52G) | ||
08/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |