|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 18/04/1934 | 20/04/1934 | 3 days | Unclassified | Water scoop fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 09/12/1935 | 23/01/1936 | 46 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1938 | 16/06/1938 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 2317 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/03/1940 | 29/04/1940 | 35 days | General | Boiler number RS129 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/05/1943 | 03/07/1943 | 34 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 25/04/1944 | 20/05/1944 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 27554 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 18/01/1947 | 19/04/1947 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 3191 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 12/10/1949 | 19/11/1949 | 39 days | Light Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64850 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 10/10/1952 | 27/10/1952 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 27564 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/11/1952 | 28/11/1952 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/08/1955 | 17/09/1955 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 31/12/1958 | 24/01/1959 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 27827 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/03/1934 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1467 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1579 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
18/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/04/1934. Dep: 20/04/1934. Work undertaken: Water scoop fitted |
||
09/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1935. Dep: 23/01/1936. | ||
11/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1938. Dep: 16/06/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2317 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/06/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
20/01/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
26/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1940. Dep: 29/04/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number RS129 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
31/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/05/1943. Dep: 03/07/1943. | ||
25/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1944. Dep: 20/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27554 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4850 | ||
18/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1947. Dep: 19/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3191 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 12/10/1949. Dep: 19/11/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64850 |
||
29/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
04/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
10/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1952. Dep: 27/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27564 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/11/1952. Dep: 28/11/1952. | ||
26/09/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
07/08/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
18/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/08/1955. Dep: 17/09/1955. | ||
31/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1958. Dep: 24/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27827 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
09/07/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Malton (50F) | ||
25/02/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64850 from Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
04/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |