|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 09/04/1934 | 11/04/1934 | 3 days | Unclassified | Water scoop fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 02/10/1935 | 11/11/1935 | 41 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/02/1938 | 08/03/1938 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 27455 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/01/1940 | 07/02/1940 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2099 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/02/1941 | 18/03/1941 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 27/01/1942 | 21/02/1942 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 2712 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/02/1943 | 02/03/1943 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/10/1944 | 11/11/1944 | 25 days | General | Boiler number BP135 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 18/05/1946 | 15/06/1946 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/05/1947 | 19/07/1947 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 2917 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 01/07/1948 | 17/07/1948 | 17 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 64849 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/11/1949 | 03/12/1949 | 30 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/04/1950 | 06/05/1950 | 36 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/02/1951 | 17/03/1951 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27465 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 09/10/1953 | 21/11/1953 | 44 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gateshead Works | 24/02/1955 | 04/03/1955 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/11/1956 | 15/12/1956 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 27629 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/08/1947 | Cowlairs Works | On 24/8 the following withdrawn locos. were in the Works yard: 'Dl' 2212, 'D29' 2415 and 'D31' 2068, the last two having been stripped; whilst those seen here newly painted were: 'D29' 2411 (green), 'J37' 4617 and 'J39' 4704. Locos. awaiting works, some of which had been stripped were: 'J39' 4711, 4817/40/49/65, 4919/22/28/42; 'K2' 1732/46/51/68/91; 'K3' 1879; 'D1' 2216; 'Dll' 2691; 'J38' 5909; 'J36' 5223/61; 'J35' 4503; 'J37' 4546/48/65/67, 4607/15; 'D31' 2059; 'D34' 2489; 'C15' 7453/65/66, 'N14' 9121; 'N15' 9191, 9214. The Erecting Shop was full and included: 'K2' 1720/34/52; 'K3' 1855; 'J39' 4912/16; 'J38' 5901/12; 'Dll' 2684/87 and 'Y9' 8120/22. | SLS/194710 |
07/09/1947 | Eastfield MPD | Nos. 4852 an 4927 (both BLA) were observed here on 7/9, awaiting shops. Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during September are: Nos. *1734/*1782, 1855, 2476/89, *2684/*2687, 2702, 4548, 4636, 4840/49, 4916/19/23/28, 5901/8/9/12, 7453/66, 7600, 8122, 8328, 8468/80, 9133, 9214/16 an 9564, whilst those observed on 1/10 were: *1732, 2455/73, 4578, 4865, 4922 an 9160 . *Painted green. On 11/10 'J83' No. 8474 was on shed, being ex Works and painted green. This engine now has a Gresham and Craven type 'P' solid jet ejector and an old (trigger) pattern steam brake valve. 'J37' No. 4546 has L.M.S. type water gauge frames with Dewrance protectors. | SLS/194711 |
31/10/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 61219, 61779/81, 61855, 1900, 62432/78, 2484, 3071, 3134/47/75/84, 4565, 64578, 4639, 4711/92, 4816, 64849, 4927, 65929/31, 7484/95, 8332/48, 68456, 69130, 9165, 69199, 9216, 69514, 9562, 77119, 79265. | SLS/194912 |
30/04/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 60529, 61103/72, 61738/68, 61854, 61909/83, 62423, 2430, 62436, 2475, 62479, 3143, 4544, 64593, 64849/54, 4865/68, 64899, 4917, 65921, 7469, 8458, 8550, 9151/62, 69174, 9182, 69553, 90071, 90306, ex-L.M.S. 2835, 42909/18, ex-W.D. 77087, 77107, 77302/99. | SLS/195006 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/03/1934 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1463 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1578 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
09/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/04/1934. Dep: 11/04/1934. Work undertaken: Water scoop fitted |
||
02/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1935. Dep: 11/11/1935. | ||
01/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1938. Dep: 08/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27455 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1940. Dep: 07/02/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2099 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/02/1941. Dep: 18/03/1941. | ||
27/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1942. Dep: 21/02/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2712 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/02/1943. Dep: 02/03/1943. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
26/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
18/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1944. Dep: 11/11/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number BP135 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/05/1946. Dep: 15/06/1946. | ||
10/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4849 | ||
03/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1947. Dep: 19/07/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2917 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/07/1948. Dep: 17/07/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64849 |
||
04/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 04/11/1949. Dep: 03/12/1949. | ||
01/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 01/04/1950. Dep: 06/05/1950. | ||
08/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1951. Dep: 17/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27465 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/10/1953. Dep: 21/11/1953. | ||
24/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/02/1955. Dep: 04/03/1955. | ||
21/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1956. Dep: 15/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27629 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
10/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
09/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
16/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64849 from West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
03/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |