|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 20/09/1933 | 25/09/1933 | 6 days | Unclassified | Cleaned for Shildon Exhibition |
||
Darlington Works | 24/05/1934 | 22/06/1934 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 1913 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/09/1936 | 13/11/1936 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 1916 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/11/1936 | 26/11/1936 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/11/1938 | 05/12/1938 | 13 days | Unclassified | Tender change |
||
Gorton Works | 27/06/1939 | 22/07/1939 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 2223 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/03/1942 | 18/04/1942 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 2571 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 01/02/1944 | 23/12/1944 | 327 days | General | Boiler number C1715 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 05/03/1946 | 13/04/1946 | 40 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/02/1947 | 07/06/1947 | 110 days | General | Boiler number C1739 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 18/11/1949 | 17/12/1949 | 30 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 31/03/1952 | 10/05/1952 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27543 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 03/07/1952 | 11/08/1952 | 40 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/01/1954 | 13/02/1954 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gateshead Works | 15/09/1955 | 23/09/1955 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/01/1957 | 23/02/1957 | 32 days | General | Not repaired Boiler number 27631 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 60501/05, 61002, 1293, 61701/49/86/88, 61857, 61909, 2422, 62426, 62706, 3049, 3126, 4548/90, 4615/16, 4706, 64794, 4842, 4923/41, 5902, 65907, 5909/12/26, 7477, 67608, 8121, 8445, 8503, 8952, 9143/76/88, 69199, 9205, 90004, 73798, 77342/71. | SLS/195001 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/08/1932 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1453 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1558 Allocated to Neville Hill (NEV) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
20/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/09/1933. Dep: 25/09/1933. Work undertaken: Cleaned for Shildon Exhibition |
||
24/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1934. Dep: 22/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1913 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1936. Dep: 13/11/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1916 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/11/1936. Dep: 26/11/1936. | ||
23/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/11/1938. Dep: 05/12/1938. Work undertaken: Tender change |
||
27/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1939. Dep: 22/07/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2223 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1942. Dep: 18/04/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2571 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
19/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
01/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1944. Dep: 23/12/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1715 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/02/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4842 | ||
05/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/03/1946. Dep: 13/04/1946. | ||
18/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1947. Dep: 07/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1739 (Diagram 97) |
||
31/01/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 64842 | ||
18/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 18/11/1949. Dep: 17/12/1949. | ||
31/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1952. Dep: 10/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27543 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/07/1952. Dep: 11/08/1952. | ||
11/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/01/1954. Dep: 13/02/1954. | ||
15/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/09/1955. Dep: 23/09/1955. | ||
23/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1957. Dep: 23/02/1957. Work undertaken: Not repaired Boiler number 27631 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
18/04/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64842 from Heaton (52B) | ||
01/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |