|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 27/04/1934 | 17/05/1934 | 21 days | General | Boiler number 27721 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/02/1937 | 13/03/1937 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 2109 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/04/1940 | 04/05/1940 | 10 days | General | Boiler number 2203 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 03/11/1943 | 20/11/1943 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 2660 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/10/1946 | 13/11/1946 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 2284 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4835 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/09/1947 | 27/09/1947 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 8026 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/09/1949 | 08/10/1949 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 1916 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64835 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/10/1953 | 28/11/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 25804 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/06/1954 | 15/06/1954 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/10/1956 | 03/11/1956 | 33 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/12/1958 | 17/01/1959 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 27661 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/04/1954 | Wetherby Races, Easter Monday | Excursion trains between Leeds City and Wetherby Racecourse station on Easter Monday were well filled and worked by the following J39's from Neville Hill (50B):-64791, 64819/35/86, 64920/22/33/35/43, and also brought in D49 62748 (50B). The excursions from Bradford and Harrogate brought in 62746/58/62 (all 50D), whilst two trains from the Huddersfield area were worked by 45218 (25A) and 42863 (25B). The excursion from Heeley (Sheffield) was, however, worked by 45015 (3B-Bushbury), rather a far cry from Wolverhampton. In addition, the 4.28 p.m. ordinary passenger service from Leeds City to Church Fenton via Wetherby, hauled by 61256 (50B), called specially at Wetherby Racecourse station to pick up. | SLS/195406 |
14/07/1962 | Darlington MPD (Awaiting Works) | Stored: 43070 (51L), 43101 (51L), 65768, 65772, 65773, 69002 (51A), 78015 (51J). Ex Works: 43014 (50A), 43125 (50B), 60834 (62B), 60944 (52B), 60973 (63A), 62004 (51A), 63389 (51L), 68043 (51A), 90011 (51A), 90273 (51L), 90430 (51A), 92098 (52H). Awaiting Works: 42639 (50F), 43134 (66D), 46494 (31A), 60818 (64A), 64706 (52G), 64713, 64730 (51L), 64757 (51L), 64758 (51L), 64821 (51L), 64835 (51F), 64848 (51F), 64982 (51F), 65670, 65761, 65776. Visitors : D12 (55H), 42553 (50A), 60040 (52A). | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/02/1932 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2974 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1543 Allocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
18/04/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
27/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1934. Dep: 17/05/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27721 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1937. Dep: 13/03/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2109 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1940. Dep: 04/05/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2203 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1943. Dep: 20/11/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2660 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
22/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1946. Dep: 13/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2284 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4835 |
||
02/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1947. Dep: 27/09/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8026 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1949. Dep: 08/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1916 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64835 |
||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
28/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1953. Dep: 28/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 25804 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/06/1954. Dep: 15/06/1954. | ||
02/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/10/1956. Dep: 03/11/1956. | ||
19/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1958. Dep: 17/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27661 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
11/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64835 from West Auckland (51F) | ||
02/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |