|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 11/12/1931 | 18/12/1931 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 19/12/1931 | 31/12/1931 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 19/01/1934 | 09/02/1934 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 8585 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/05/1936 | 23/05/1936 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 8006 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/07/1938 | 27/08/1938 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2095 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/01/1940 | 28/12/1940 | 340 days | General | Boiler number 1912 (Diagram 97) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/08/1943 | 06/10/1943 | 63 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/04/1944 | 29/04/1944 | 28 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 09/09/1945 | 08/12/1945 | 91 days | General | Boiler number 2681 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/10/1947 | 03/01/1948 | 73 days | General | Boiler number 2316 (Diagram 97) |
||
Derby Works | 17/05/1950 | 18/07/1950 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 2672 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64827 |
||
Gorton Works | 07/01/1953 | 28/03/1953 | 81 days | General | Boiler number 27750 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/04/1955 | 28/05/1955 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27838 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/09/1955 | 05/11/1955 | 41 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 06/10/1957 | 16/11/1957 | 42 days | General | Not repaired Boiler number 27794 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
15/07/1950 | Derby Works (Works Yard) | 42146 almost complete; UTA.56 complete and painted; UTA.57 nearly complete. First two sets of frames in position for order No. 4310. Nos. 404, 40411/6, 43364 in store near station, joined a fortnight later by 43342 an 43482. Fresh off Works: 47000, 2035, 43900/61 repainted with emblem; 42503, 43985, 44007, 44200, 47233, 58075, 58234 lettered L.M.S.; 40656, 40925, 41064/96, 42377/93 lined black, with emblem; 40671 'British Railways'; 42311 unlined. In Paint Shop 58054 (ex 1341) with emblem. For shops W/E 15/7/50: 434, 40535, 41051, 41168, 1889, 42351/3, 42406, 3101, 43690, 43892/98, 44112/72, 7342, 58224, 64722, 64951, 4969. Still in Works Yard at end of July: 22853, 3511, 41034, 43297, 43818, 58036, 58229 (condemned). 24/7/50: Ex Works: 2070 still lettered G.W.R. 64827 repainted with emblem; 64903, tender lettered L.N.E.R.; 42503 lettered L.M.S. 30/7/50: 42146, UTA.56/57, Order 4310 as on 13th. Nos. 12070/1 complete, 12072/3 almost complete; 10800 in Diesel shop; 41060 lined with 'British Railways' on tender; 41181 has tender unlined with emblem; 42340 lined black with emblem. | SLS/195010 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/12/1931 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2966 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1535 Allocated to Lincoln (LIN) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
11/12/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/12/1931. Dep: 18/12/1931. | ||
19/12/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/12/1931. Dep: 31/12/1931. | ||
19/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1934. Dep: 09/02/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8585 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1936. Dep: 23/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8006 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1938. Dep: 27/08/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2095 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1940. Dep: 28/12/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1912 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1943. Dep: 06/10/1943. | ||
02/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1944. Dep: 29/04/1944. | ||
17/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
09/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1945. Dep: 08/12/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2681 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
15/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4827 | ||
22/12/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
23/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1947. Dep: 03/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2316 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1950. Dep: 18/07/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2672 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64827 |
||
07/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1953. Dep: 28/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27750 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1955. Dep: 28/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27838 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/09/1955. Dep: 05/11/1955. | ||
06/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1957. Dep: 16/11/1957. Work undertaken: Not repaired Boiler number 27794 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/03/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
01/02/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64827 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
03/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |