|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 30/11/1933 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 21/03/1936 | 1 day | General | Boiler number C1801 (Diagram 97) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 16/04/1938 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 10/08/1938 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 05/01/1940 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 08/02/1940 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 11/10/1940 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 27/06/1942 | 1 day | General | Boiler number 4902 (Diagram 97) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 09/10/1942 | 1 day | Heavy | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 10/08/1944 | 1 day | Heavy | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 11/08/1945 | 25/08/1945 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/11/1945 | 15/12/1945 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/01/1947 | 12/03/1947 | 69 days | Heavy | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/08/1947 | 23/08/1947 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/04/1949 | 21/05/1949 | 32 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64822 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 03/03/1952 | 05/04/1952 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 27565 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 19/03/1954 | 01/05/1954 | 44 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 30/07/1956 | 01/09/1956 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 27570 (Diagram 97) |
||
Inverurie Works | 09/11/1959 | 11/12/1959 | 33 days | HfL |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
12/06/1963 | Inverurie Works (Scrapped) | In Works: 42273, 45176, 61076, 61103, D8032. Shopped in four weeks ending 7th June : 64588, D362, D6155, 44960, 65930, 61404. Scrapped in same period: 64581, 65217/57/304, 64822, 65928; 64499, 65237. Being scrapped: 57617/31, 68346, 90077/575. Awaiting scrapping or shopping-64599/600, 64795, 64950/86. 64946 was waiting at Kittybrewster. | SLS/196307 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/02/1930 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2788 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1494 Allocated to Eastfield (EFD) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
30/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1933. | ||
21/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1801 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1938. | ||
10/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/08/1938. | ||
05/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1940. | ||
08/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/02/1940. | ||
11/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/10/1940. | ||
27/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4902 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/10/1942. | ||
11/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
25/11/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
10/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 10/08/1944. | ||
11/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/08/1945. Dep: 25/08/1945. | ||
17/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/11/1945. Dep: 15/12/1945. | ||
03/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4822 | ||
03/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 03/01/1947. Dep: 12/03/1947. | ||
30/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
16/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/08/1947. Dep: 23/08/1947. | ||
20/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/04/1949. Dep: 21/05/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64822 |
||
03/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1952. Dep: 05/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27565 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/03/1954. Dep: 01/05/1954. | ||
30/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1956. Dep: 01/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27570 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/11/1959 | Works Visit | |||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64822 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
07/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |