|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 01/12/1931 | 21/01/1932 | 52 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 22/01/1934 | 09/02/1934 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 2222 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/04/1936 | 28/05/1936 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2116 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1938 | 22/07/1938 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 2717 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/05/1940 | 07/06/1940 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 27459 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/07/1942 | 05/09/1942 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 12/07/1943 | 07/08/1943 | 27 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/04/1945 | 12/05/1945 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2935 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 17/11/1947 | 10/01/1948 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 2715 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/12/1950 | 13/01/1951 | 25 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64819 |
||
Darlington Works | 30/03/1951 | 04/04/1951 | 6 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/11/1951 | 21/12/1951 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/10/1952 | 20/11/1952 | 39 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/12/1953 | 29/01/1954 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27567 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/09/1956 | 20/10/1956 | 31 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/10/1958 | 01/11/1958 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27456 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 30/07/1959 | 21/08/1959 | 23 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/09/1959 | 18/09/1959 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/05/1960 | 24/06/1960 | 32 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1946 | Queens Park Works | During December twelve new Class 'B1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1102-1113 inclusive (74 in 8&nfrac12; months), No. 1111 being the N.B. Loco. Co.'s 'Christmas present' to the L.N.E.R.-it was ex Works on 25.12.46! No. 1112 was ex Works 27.12.46, and 1113 on either Mon-day 30th or Tuesday 31st, before the Works closed down for the New Year holidays. 1111 ran trials on 28/12, and on 4/1/47 was observed working the 2.25 p.m. Glasgow-Edinburgh train. Works Nos. checked are as follows: 1106 (25859/46), 1107 (26861/46), 1109 (25865/46), 1110 (25866/46), 1111 (25867/46), 1112 (25868/46). It will be noted there is further confusion. On 23/12 1114 was noted in Q.P. Works Erecting Shop with Works plates 25870/46, although 1113 had no plates fitted. The Maker's plates are not usually fitted until the engine is in the Paint Shop. On the above date up to 1116 (which only lacked wheels), were noted in the Works. 1111 and 1112 were in the Paint Shop. No. 6399 'D.11' 'Allan-Bane' was noted at Eastfleld on 2/1/47 still un-Renumbered. This must be one of the very few not yet renumbered in Scotland. The last one noted was 'J6' 9668 in Cowlairs Works Yard on 7/12/46, and 'V.2' 4819 on the same day. 9668 has since appeared as 5240. | SLS/194702 |
19/04/1954 | Wetherby Races, Easter Monday | Excursion trains between Leeds City and Wetherby Racecourse station on Easter Monday were well filled and worked by the following J39's from Neville Hill (50B):-64791, 64819/35/86, 64920/22/33/35/43, and also brought in D49 62748 (50B). The excursions from Bradford and Harrogate brought in 62746/58/62 (all 50D), whilst two trains from the Huddersfield area were worked by 45218 (25A) and 42863 (25B). The excursion from Heeley (Sheffield) was, however, worked by 45015 (3B-Bushbury), rather a far cry from Wolverhampton. In addition, the 4.28 p.m. ordinary passenger service from Leeds City to Church Fenton via Wetherby, hauled by 61256 (50B), called specially at Wetherby Racecourse station to pick up. | SLS/195406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/01/1930 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1491 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1491 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
01/12/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1931. Dep: 21/01/1932. | ||
22/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1934. Dep: 09/02/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2222 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1936. Dep: 28/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2116 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1938. Dep: 22/07/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2717 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1940. Dep: 07/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27459 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1942. Dep: 05/09/1942. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
12/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/07/1943. Dep: 07/08/1943. | ||
14/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1945. Dep: 12/05/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2935 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4819 | ||
17/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1947. Dep: 10/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2715 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
19/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
25/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
27/08/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
20/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/12/1950. Dep: 13/01/1951. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64819 |
||
30/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/03/1951. Dep: 04/04/1951. | ||
27/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/11/1951. Dep: 21/12/1951. | ||
13/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/10/1952. Dep: 20/11/1952. | ||
24/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1953. Dep: 29/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27567 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
20/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 20/09/1956. Dep: 20/10/1956. | ||
02/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1958. Dep: 01/11/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27456 (Diagram 97) |
||
30/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/07/1959. Dep: 21/08/1959. | ||
15/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/09/1959. Dep: 18/09/1959. | ||
24/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/05/1960. Dep: 24/06/1960. | ||
09/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
12/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64819 from Hull Dairycoates (50B) |