|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 11/08/1931 | 21/08/1931 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 17/09/1931 | 23/10/1931 | 37 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 13/06/1932 | 21/06/1932 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 19/06/1934 | 02/08/1934 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 2317 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/10/1937 | 07/12/1937 | 43 days | General | Boiler number RS129 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/11/1939 | 22/12/1939 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2303 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/09/1941 | 07/10/1941 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2617 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 21/02/1944 | 18/03/1944 | 27 days | General | Boiler number BP133 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 25/05/1946 | 29/06/1946 | 36 days | General | Boiler number BP136 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gateshead Works | 19/01/1948 | 19/02/1948 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/03/1949 | 16/04/1949 | 30 days | Light Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64813 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 16/08/1951 | 15/09/1951 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27451 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 16/10/1951 | 13/11/1951 | 29 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 12/11/1952 | 26/11/1952 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 31/07/1953 | 07/08/1953 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 26/08/1953 | 16/09/1953 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/09/1955 | 22/10/1955 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 27568 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 05/11/1959 | 12/12/1959 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 25834 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/12/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1425 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1485 Allocated to Blaydon (BLA) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
11/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/08/1931. Dep: 21/08/1931. | ||
17/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1931. Dep: 23/10/1931. | ||
13/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/06/1932. Dep: 21/06/1932. | ||
19/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1934. Dep: 02/08/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2317 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1937. Dep: 07/12/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number RS129 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1939. Dep: 22/12/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2303 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1941. Dep: 07/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2617 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1944. Dep: 18/03/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number BP133 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1946. Dep: 29/06/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number BP136 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4813 | ||
19/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/01/1948. Dep: 19/02/1948. | ||
28/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
18/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 18/03/1949. Dep: 16/04/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64813 |
||
16/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1951. Dep: 15/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27451 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/10/1951. Dep: 13/11/1951. | ||
12/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/11/1952. Dep: 26/11/1952. | ||
31/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/07/1953. Dep: 07/08/1953. | ||
26/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/08/1953. Dep: 16/09/1953. | ||
19/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1955. Dep: 22/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27568 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1959. Dep: 12/12/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 25834 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64813 from Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
02/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |