|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 23/02/1932 | 19/03/1932 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 2186 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/04/1934 | 21/04/1934 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 2299 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/08/1936 | 19/09/1936 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2316 (Diagram 97) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/10/1938 | 17/11/1938 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 24/02/1941 | 19/04/1941 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 2636 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/07/1943 | 22/08/1943 | 33 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/02/1944 | 09/04/1944 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 2922 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/08/1944 | 28/10/1944 | 62 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 09/01/1947 | 09/07/1947 | 182 days | General | Boiler number 2291 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/09/1949 | 12/11/1949 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 2108 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64811 |
||
Gorton Works | 16/11/1949 | 17/11/1949 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 27/07/1952 | 10/09/1952 | 46 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Derby Works | 13/09/1952 | 27/09/1952 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 05/11/1953 | 21/11/1953 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 24/11/1953 | 28/11/1953 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 11/08/1955 | 01/10/1955 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 27793 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/10/1955 | 13/10/1955 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 17/10/1955 | 19/10/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 27/10/1955 | 31/10/1955 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 03/02/1959 | 13/03/1959 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate | Not repaired |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/11/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2785 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1483 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
10/12/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
23/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1932. Dep: 19/03/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2186 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/03/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
03/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1934. Dep: 21/04/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2299 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/02/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
19/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1936. Dep: 19/09/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2316 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1938. Dep: 17/11/1938. | ||
24/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1941. Dep: 19/04/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2636 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1943. Dep: 22/08/1943. | ||
22/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1944. Dep: 09/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2922 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/08/1944. Dep: 28/10/1944. | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
05/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4811 | ||
09/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1947. Dep: 09/07/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2291 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1949. Dep: 12/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2108 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64811 |
||
16/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/11/1949. Dep: 17/11/1949. | ||
27/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/07/1952. Dep: 10/09/1952. | ||
13/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/09/1952. Dep: 27/09/1952. | ||
05/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/11/1953. Dep: 21/11/1953. | ||
24/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/11/1953. Dep: 28/11/1953. | ||
11/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1955. Dep: 01/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27793 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/10/1955. Dep: 13/10/1955. | ||
17/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/10/1955. Dep: 19/10/1955. | ||
27/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/10/1955. Dep: 31/10/1955. | ||
03/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/02/1959. Dep: 13/03/1959. Work undertaken: Not repaired |
||
30/03/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64811 from Ardsley (56B) | ||
04/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |