|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 03/10/1932 | 29/10/1932 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 8025 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1934 | 01/12/1934 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 2274 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/08/1936 | 24/09/1936 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 8593 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/07/1938 | 06/08/1938 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 8013 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/08/1939 | 07/10/1939 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 2210 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/05/1941 | 02/08/1941 | 80 days | General | Boiler number 2767 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/01/1943 | 26/04/1943 | 114 days | General | Boiler number 2300 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 08/02/1946 | 01/06/1946 | 114 days | General | Boiler number 8580 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/08/1948 | 18/09/1948 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 2290 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64806 |
||
Derby Works | 31/08/1951 | 22/10/1951 | 53 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Derby Works | 29/10/1951 | 14/11/1951 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 16/04/1953 | 02/05/1953 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 01/05/1954 | 05/06/1954 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 27689 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/06/1954 | 19/06/1954 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 09/01/1956 | 18/02/1956 | 41 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 12/09/1957 | 02/11/1957 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 27730 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/03/1961 | 28/04/1961 | 53 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/11/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2780 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1477 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
08/11/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
15/11/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
20/06/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
04/08/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
19/08/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
03/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1932. Dep: 29/10/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8025 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1934. Dep: 01/12/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2274 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1936. Dep: 24/09/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8593 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1938. Dep: 06/08/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8013 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1939. Dep: 07/10/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2210 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1941. Dep: 02/08/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2767 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1943. Dep: 26/04/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2300 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
26/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
16/02/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
08/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1946. Dep: 01/06/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8580 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
01/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4806 | ||
05/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1948. Dep: 18/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2290 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64806 |
||
31/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 31/08/1951. Dep: 22/10/1951. | ||
29/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/10/1951. Dep: 14/11/1951. | ||
16/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/04/1953. Dep: 02/05/1953. | ||
01/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1954. Dep: 05/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27689 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/06/1954. Dep: 19/06/1954. | ||
09/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/01/1956. Dep: 18/02/1956. | ||
12/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1957. Dep: 02/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27730 (Diagram 97) |
||
13/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
07/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/03/1961. Dep: 28/04/1961. | ||
14/01/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
17/05/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64806 from Sunderland (52G) | ||
07/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |