|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 07/10/1931 | 21/11/1931 | 46 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1934 | 31/05/1934 | 14 days | General | Boiler number 8580 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/05/1936 | 11/07/1936 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 1917 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/03/1939 | 25/03/1939 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 8587 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 23/11/1941 | 19/03/1942 | 117 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 19/08/1942 | 04/09/1942 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 11/08/1944 | 07/10/1944 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 2094 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 16/03/1945 | 14/04/1945 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 21/07/1946 | 23/11/1946 | 126 days | General | Boiler number 3215 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4800 |
||
Stratford Works | 21/08/1947 | 28/08/1947 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 30/12/1949 | 25/02/1950 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 2102 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64800 |
||
Derby Works | 11/01/1952 | 28/02/1952 | 49 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Derby Works | 09/10/1952 | 24/11/1952 | 47 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 06/09/1953 | 16/09/1953 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 23/09/1953 | 24/09/1953 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 04/10/1954 | 13/11/1954 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27688 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 10/03/1957 | 18/04/1957 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27882 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/09/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2774 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1471 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
28/09/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
07/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1931. Dep: 21/11/1931. | ||
18/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1934. Dep: 31/05/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8580 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1936. Dep: 11/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1917 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1939. Dep: 25/03/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8587 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/10/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
23/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1941. Dep: 19/03/1942. | ||
19/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/08/1942. Dep: 04/09/1942. | ||
12/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
07/11/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) | ||
11/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1944. Dep: 07/10/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2094 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/03/1945. Dep: 14/04/1945. | ||
21/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1946. Dep: 23/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3215 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4800 |
||
21/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/08/1947. Dep: 28/08/1947. | ||
30/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1949. Dep: 25/02/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2102 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64800 |
||
11/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 11/01/1952. Dep: 28/02/1952. | ||
09/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/10/1952. Dep: 24/11/1952. | ||
06/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/09/1953. Dep: 16/09/1953. | ||
23/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/09/1953. Dep: 24/09/1953. | ||
04/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1954. Dep: 13/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27688 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1957. Dep: 18/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27882 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
01/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
21/01/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64800 from March (31B) |