|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 02/1931 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 17/03/1933 | General | Boiler number C1801 (Diagram 97) |
||||
Cowlairs Works | 19/09/1934 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 21/03/1936 | 1 day | General | Boiler number C1739 (Diagram 97) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 04/06/1937 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 16/04/1939 | 1 day | General | Boiler number C1738 (Diagram 97) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 28/09/1940 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 29/11/1941 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 19/08/1942 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 20/03/1943 | 1 day | Heavy | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 28/10/1944 | 1 day | General | Boiler number 2143 (Diagram 97) |
|||
Inverurie Works | 31/03/1945 | 31/05/1945 | 62 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 25/03/1947 | 12/04/1947 | 19 days | Heavy | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/04/1948 | 15/05/1948 | 23 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 64794 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/11/1949 | 24/12/1949 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27568 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/01/1950 | 06/01/1950 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/11/1952 | 05/12/1952 | 19 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/07/1955 | 13/08/1955 | 44 days | General | W.P.U. gear removed Boiler number 27534 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 22/08/1955 | 25/08/1955 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 31/08/1955 | 03/09/1955 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/05/1957 | 07/06/1957 | 37 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Inverurie Works | 25/08/1960 | 28/09/1960 | 35 days | Light Intermediate | A.W.S. fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 60501/05, 61002, 1293, 61701/49/86/88, 61857, 61909, 2422, 62426, 62706, 3049, 3126, 4548/90, 4615/16, 4706, 64794, 4842, 4923/41, 5902, 65907, 5909/12/26, 7477, 67608, 8121, 8445, 8503, 8952, 9143/76/88, 69199, 9205, 90004, 73798, 77342/71. | SLS/195001 |
15/10/1962 | Inverurie Works | In shops: 45461, 64595, 65910; waiting: 80093. Awaiting scrapping: 44008, 47168, 47536, 57331/378/613, 65313, 69204. Scrapped five weeks ended 12/10; 57445/671, 64598/607, 64604/30, 64480/637/794. | SLS/196211 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/07/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2741 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1465 Allocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
01/08/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/02/1931. | ||
17/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Dep: 17/03/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1801 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1934. | ||
21/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1739 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1937. | ||
16/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1738 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1940. | ||
29/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1941. | ||
19/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/08/1942. | ||
20/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 20/03/1943. | ||
28/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2143 (Diagram 97) |
||
31/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/03/1945. Dep: 31/05/1945. | ||
09/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4794 | ||
25/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 25/03/1947. Dep: 12/04/1947. | ||
23/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/04/1948. Dep: 15/05/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64794 |
||
24/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1949. Dep: 24/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27568 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
24/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
04/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/01/1950. Dep: 06/01/1950. | ||
17/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 17/11/1952. Dep: 05/12/1952. | ||
10/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bathgate (64F) | ||
31/01/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
01/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1955. Dep: 13/08/1955. Work undertaken: W.P.U. gear removed Boiler number 27534 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/08/1955. Dep: 25/08/1955. | ||
31/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/08/1955. Dep: 03/09/1955. | ||
02/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 02/05/1957. Dep: 07/06/1957. | ||
11/08/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) | ||
25/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 25/08/1960. Dep: 28/09/1960. Work undertaken: A.W.S. fitted |
||
18/12/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
13/08/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64794 from Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
10/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |