|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 11/1930 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 05/1932 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 20/04/1934 | 15/05/1934 | 26 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/03/1935 | 22/03/1935 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/08/1935 | 02/08/1935 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/06/1936 | 24/06/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number C1740 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/01/1938 | 12/02/1938 | 24 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/12/1938 | 29/12/1938 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/08/1939 | 22/08/1939 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/04/1940 | 17/05/1940 | 21 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/07/1940 | 04/07/1940 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/10/1940 | 25/10/1940 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 30/06/1942 | 28/08/1942 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 27556 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 16/07/1943 | 09/08/1943 | 25 days | Light Repair | Tender only |
||
Cowlairs Works | 03/11/1945 | 29/12/1945 | 57 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/12/1945 | 12/01/1946 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/09/1947 | 20/12/1947 | 86 days | General | Boiler number C1716 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 11/06/1948 | 03/07/1948 | 23 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 64791 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 16/10/1951 | 10/11/1951 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 27591 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 15/11/1951 | 08/12/1951 | 24 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/12/1953 | 26/12/1953 | 25 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/07/1957 | 10/08/1957 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27743 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/02/1961 | 25/03/1961 | 28 days | Light Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/06/1948 | Cowlairs Works (yard) | Locomotives in the yard awaiting repair were Nos. 502, 1745, 2436/39, 4532, 4600, 4791, 5237, 5913, 8118, 8350, 8955, 9178, 9503/11, 61002 an 61735-the last two being lettered B.R. Locomotives in the Works were: Stripping Pit Nos. 1102, 9927; Erecting Shop Nos. 1116, 1774/75/77/92/94, 1885, 1916/95, 2686/90, 4524/50/60/89, 4821, 7492, 8567, 9126/45, 61767; Steaming Pits Nos. 1787, 4925, 61134, 61292, 69206; Paint Shop Nos. 1101, 1783. 61292 is fitted with ex L.M.S. tablet catcher and is to be used on Perth-Inverness trials. | SLS/194808 |
19/04/1954 | Wetherby Races, Easter Monday | Excursion trains between Leeds City and Wetherby Racecourse station on Easter Monday were well filled and worked by the following J39's from Neville Hill (50B):-64791, 64819/35/86, 64920/22/33/35/43, and also brought in D49 62748 (50B). The excursions from Bradford and Harrogate brought in 62746/58/62 (all 50D), whilst two trains from the Huddersfield area were worked by 45218 (25A) and 42863 (25B). The excursion from Heeley (Sheffield) was, however, worked by 45015 (3B-Bushbury), rather a far cry from Wolverhampton. In addition, the 4.28 p.m. ordinary passenger service from Leeds City to Church Fenton via Wetherby, hauled by 61256 (50B), called specially at Wetherby Racecourse station to pick up. | SLS/195406 |
14/08/1963 | Crewe Works (Dismantling Shed) | Erecting Shop: D1030-34, D1073, D1550-58 UC (in various stages), D202/24/32/36/87, D316, 46230, 46442, 44812/96, 44936, 45070/94, 45310/40, 45421/31, 48121/64, 48766, 70018/50, 73166, 90384, 92014/56/83/105/113/133/154/167/173/191. Outside Erecting Shop: 44674, 45414/51, 48409, 82038, 12134/240. Stripped down in Yard: 92084/132/151/162. Dismantling Shed: 49448, 64791, 64907, 90095. On Scrap Road: 63808/17/65. Yard: D215/98, D338/344, 42151, 44826/909/81, 45218/305/398, 48035/133/296/751/770, 70004/21, 73025, 75000, 84012, 92100. Electric and Diesel Shop: 26057, 27002/4. Paint Shop: D1069/70/71/72, 45295, 45573, 49395, 26010, 1439 and Lion. Outside Paint Shop: D227/90, D335/79, D8007/21, 45283, 48502/618/709, 70020, 92020/40/86/123/192. On 21st July, Royal Scot 46151 was in the dismantling shed being broken-up, and 46152 was in the erecting shop having a casual. | SLS/196309 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/07/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2738 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1462 Allocated to Eastfield (EFD) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/11/1930. | ||
05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/05/1932. | ||
20/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1934. Dep: 15/05/1934. | ||
21/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/03/1935. Dep: 22/03/1935. | ||
01/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/08/1935. Dep: 02/08/1935. | ||
03/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1936. Dep: 24/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1740 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1938. Dep: 12/02/1938. | ||
21/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/12/1938. Dep: 29/12/1938. | ||
03/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/08/1939. Dep: 22/08/1939. | ||
27/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1940. Dep: 17/05/1940. | ||
02/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/07/1940. Dep: 04/07/1940. | ||
22/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/10/1940. Dep: 25/10/1940. | ||
30/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1942. Dep: 28/08/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27556 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/07/1943. Dep: 09/08/1943. Work undertaken: Tender only |
||
18/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
03/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1945. Dep: 29/12/1945. | ||
15/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/12/1945. Dep: 12/01/1946. | ||
05/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4791 | ||
30/12/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT) | ||
10/01/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
26/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1947. Dep: 20/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1716 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/06/1948. Dep: 03/07/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64791 |
||
17/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
29/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
04/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
16/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1951. Dep: 10/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27591 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/11/1951. Dep: 08/12/1951. | ||
02/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/12/1953. Dep: 26/12/1953. | ||
02/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1957. Dep: 10/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27743 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G) | ||
12/01/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
26/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 26/02/1961. Dep: 25/03/1961. | ||
26/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64791 from Low Moor (56F) | ||
09/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |