|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 23/02/1932 | 07/04/1932 | 45 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/07/1932 | 15/07/1932 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/05/1933 | 02/06/1933 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/04/1934 | 21/05/1934 | 42 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/11/1935 | 23/12/1935 | 35 days | General | Boiler number C1718 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 09/04/1937 | 18/05/1937 | 40 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/12/1938 | 05/01/1939 | 22 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/10/1939 | 16/11/1939 | 29 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/03/1941 | 15/05/1941 | 53 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/12/1942 | 16/01/1943 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 27483 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 25/08/1943 | 28/08/1943 | 4 days | Heavy | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/04/1944 | 18/05/1944 | 27 days | Heavy | Boiler number 2303 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 05/07/1945 | 04/08/1945 | 31 days | Heavy | |||
Inverurie Works | 21/03/1946 | 01/05/1946 | 42 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 15/04/1947 | 28/10/1947 | 197 days | General | Boiler number 2671 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/08/1948 | 16/10/1948 | 68 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 64787 |
||
Gorton Works | 26/10/1948 | 02/11/1948 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 09/10/1950 | 04/01/1951 | 88 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Stratford Works | 19/12/1951 | 18/01/1952 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 04/03/1953 | 04/05/1953 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 27745 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 26/09/1955 | 19/11/1955 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 27783 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/10/1950 | Derby Works | For shops W/E 28/10/50:-12058 18A, 40065 26A, 40433 7D, 41044 15D, 41049 17D, 41053 15C, 41166 8E, 41167 5A, 41193 27A, 42312 25B, 42402 11B, 43294 18D, 3748 15C, 3932 22B, 44176 21A, 47160 6C, 7235 19A, 47591 8B, 64787 30F. No. 40433 is for special examination, which may mean withdrawal. | SLS/195012 |
19/03/1961 | Doncaster Works (Scrap Yard) | New Erecting Shop: D2388/9, E3059-64. Stripping Road: D2402, D3489, 13252, 60040, 61144, 61227, 61828, 62013, 63954, 68522, 68869/90, 68916, 69572; Scrap Yard: 64729/87, with 64746, 68875, 68979, 69586 being cut-up. Crimpsall: 60047/90, 61066, 62061. Outside Crimpsall: 60026, 60532, 61971. Erecting Shop: 13326, D3452, D5564, D8214, D9002, 43092, 43151, 60014/28/53/8, 60102/33/8, 61066/73, 61819/32/43/89, 61939, 62009, 63949/68, 70039, 76032. Outside Erecting Shop: D2400, 60128, 68925. Weigh House: D336. Outside Weigh House: 61950. Paint Shop: D320/37, D2387, D5690/1, D6712, D9000, E3058, 60041, 60118/36, 60529, 61835, 73096. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196105 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/06/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2734 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1458 Allocated to Parkhead (PKD) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
30/10/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
23/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1932. Dep: 07/04/1932. | ||
11/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/07/1932. Dep: 15/07/1932. | ||
02/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/05/1933. Dep: 02/06/1933. | ||
07/11/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
10/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1934. Dep: 21/05/1934. | ||
19/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1935. Dep: 23/12/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1718 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1937. Dep: 18/05/1937. | ||
15/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1938. Dep: 05/01/1939. | ||
19/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1939. Dep: 16/11/1939. | ||
24/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1941. Dep: 15/05/1941. | ||
15/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1942. Dep: 16/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27483 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 25/08/1943. Dep: 28/08/1943. | ||
22/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 22/04/1944. Dep: 18/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2303 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 05/07/1945. Dep: 04/08/1945. | ||
21/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/03/1946. Dep: 01/05/1946. | ||
15/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
10/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4787 | ||
20/03/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
15/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1947. Dep: 28/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2671 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/05/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
10/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/08/1948. Dep: 16/10/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64787 |
||
26/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/10/1948. Dep: 02/11/1948. | ||
16/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
22/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
09/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/10/1950. Dep: 04/01/1951. | ||
20/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
26/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
24/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
30/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
19/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/12/1951. Dep: 18/01/1952. | ||
04/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1953. Dep: 04/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27745 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1955. Dep: 19/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27783 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/03/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
01/06/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64787 from Stratford (30A) | ||
09/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |