|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 14/12/1931 | 01/02/1932 | 50 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/11/1934 | 1 day | General | Boiler number C1715 (Diagram 97) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 08/08/1935 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 16/06/1937 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 15/04/1938 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 21/01/1939 | 25/02/1939 | 36 days | General | Boiler number C1711 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 28/12/1939 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 21/09/1940 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 29/03/1941 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 27/06/1941 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 09/02/1942 | 1 day | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 05/08/1942 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 10/02/1943 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 10/07/1943 | 14/08/1943 | 36 days | Heavy | Boiler number BP139 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/09/1945 | 13/10/1945 | 24 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/11/1945 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 22/02/1947 | 08/03/1947 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 25/11/1947 | 13/12/1947 | 19 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/01/1950 | 04/02/1950 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 27550 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64786 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 19/08/1950 | 03/10/1950 | 46 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/10/1953 | 14/11/1953 | 41 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
26/05/1955 | 01/07/1955 | 37 days | Light Casual | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 13/03/1956 | 21/04/1956 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27562 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 03/06/1958 | 28/06/1958 | 26 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/04/1959 | 06/05/1959 | 34 days | Light Casual | |||
Inverurie Works | 30/08/1961 | 24/11/1961 | 87 days | General | Boiler number 27552 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 60152, 61072, 61117/18, 61307, 1751, 61764, 1780, 61784, 2474/76/88, 2684/94, 62733, 3058, 3168, 64575, 4586, 64621/28/36, 4786, 64877/80, 4919/40, 65923, 5924, 65932, 7453/80, 68100, 8323/44, 9170, 9214, 9507, 69595, 90505, ex-W.D. 77089, 77231, 73792. | SLS/195003 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/06/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2733 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1457 Allocated to Parkhead (PKD) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
30/10/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
14/12/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1931. Dep: 01/02/1932. | ||
03/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1715 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/08/1935. | ||
16/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1937. | ||
15/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/04/1938. | ||
21/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1939. Dep: 25/02/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1711 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/12/1939. | ||
21/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1940. | ||
29/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/03/1941. | ||
27/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/06/1941. | ||
09/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1942. | ||
05/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/08/1942. | ||
10/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/02/1943. | ||
17/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
10/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 10/07/1943. Dep: 14/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number BP139 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/08/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
20/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1945. Dep: 13/10/1945. | ||
17/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/11/1945. | ||
01/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4786 | ||
22/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/02/1947. Dep: 08/03/1947. | ||
18/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
25/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1947. Dep: 13/12/1947. | ||
09/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1950. Dep: 04/02/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27550 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64786 |
||
19/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 19/08/1950. Dep: 03/10/1950. | ||
05/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/10/1953. Dep: 14/11/1953. | ||
13/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1956. Dep: 21/04/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27562 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/06/1958. Dep: 28/06/1958. | ||
03/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/04/1959. Dep: 06/05/1959. | ||
30/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1961. Dep: 24/11/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27552 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64786 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
05/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |