|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 25/09/1931 | 07/11/1931 | 44 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 29/12/1933 | 27/01/1934 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2110 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/04/1936 | 21/05/1936 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 2310 (Diagram 97) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/10/1938 | 11/11/1938 | 23 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/08/1941 | 26/09/1941 | 55 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/08/1944 | 07/10/1944 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 2136 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 06/06/1947 | 14/11/1947 | 162 days | General | |||
Derby Works | 05/10/1950 | 27/11/1950 | 54 days | Light Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64782 |
||
Derby Works | 07/12/1950 | 13/12/1950 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Derby Works | 17/07/1952 | 29/08/1952 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27715 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 14/03/1955 | 23/04/1955 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27892 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 27/07/1956 | 25/08/1956 | 30 days | Light Casual | March 18/5/58-11/3/60 ln store |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1950 | Derby Works | In addition to the normal types of L.M.S. origin, the following have come off works: 2060, 2107, 12011, 64749/82, 64807/34, 64958/9. Withdrawn engines in works yard: 3802, 20155, 22853, 58061. No. 20155 has had the number freshly painted on the smokebox door, and neatly enclosed in a white-painted rectangle. Buffer beam repainted, but boiler casing removed. Engines in for repair 2053 (82D), 12012 (8C), 12002 (5B), 64841 (32B), 64893 (36A), 64971 (40A), 64727 (9F), (6)4910 (36A), 64734 (40A), 64793 (32B), 64805 (39A), 42387/8 (87K); 7316 (71G); and the following other un-renumbered engines 7583 (26B), 2995 (18B), 524 (7B), 4294 (18A), 7131 (21A), 7298 (4A), 7300 (33A), 32 (14B); also numerous others of L.M.S. origin. Position as regards new construction on 30/11/50:-42062/3 almost complete; 42064/5 commenced; 12084/5 in paint shop, 12086 completed. Early in December another diesel, 12087 had the engines mounted, and the frames of 73000 were in the erecting shop. Among engines entering works were 509 (71G), 2988 (15B), 3827 (18A), 7503 (11C), 64802 (32A), 64979 (37A). Nos. 509, 43319 an 3827 were 'for special examination' and may not survive the ordeal. |
SLS/195101 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/05/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2729 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1453 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
24/05/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
25/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1931. Dep: 07/11/1931. | ||
29/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1933. Dep: 27/01/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2110 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1936. Dep: 21/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2310 (Diagram 97) |
||
20/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1938. Dep: 11/11/1938. | ||
03/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1941. Dep: 26/09/1941. | ||
08/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1944. Dep: 07/10/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2136 (Diagram 97) |
||
04/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4782 | ||
06/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1947. Dep: 14/11/1947. | ||
05/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 05/10/1950. Dep: 27/11/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64782 |
||
07/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/12/1950. Dep: 13/12/1950. | ||
17/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1952. Dep: 29/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27715 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1955. Dep: 23/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27892 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/07/1956. Dep: 25/08/1956. Work undertaken: March 18/5/58-11/3/60 ln store |
||
20/04/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
03/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
15/03/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64782 from March (31B) |