|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 04/09/1931 | 17/10/1931 | 44 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 05/03/1934 | 22/03/1934 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 1919 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/05/1936 | 08/08/1936 | 72 days | General | Boiler number 8775 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1936 | 14/08/1936 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 17/02/1939 | 18/03/1939 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 8581 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 01/03/1942 | 05/06/1942 | 97 days | General | Boiler number 2697 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 22/07/1945 | 15/09/1945 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 8586 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 06/06/1948 | 13/08/1948 | 69 days | General | Boiler number 4941 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64781 |
||
Derby Works | 27/01/1951 | 22/03/1951 | 55 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Stratford Works | 17/11/1953 | 02/01/1954 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 27663 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 10/09/1954 | 24/09/1954 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 05/11/1956 | 08/12/1956 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 27880 (Diagram 97) Vacuum Ejector removed |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1951 | Derby Works | During February, un-renumbered engines in Works were 7665 (5C), 7453 (10E), 762 (15D), 4409 (17A), 7125 (18A), 3334 (19A), 3449 (20B), 3656 (20D), 3257, 4203/24 (21A), 7567 (25G). Engines received from other regions for attention were (30A) 64781, (32A) 64731, (32B) 64900, (33C) 42505/11, (35C) 44476, (37A) 64760, 64840, (E) 4907, (38A) 64716, 64965, (40A) 64725, 64886, (71G) 44560, (71H) 43194, (84J) 2183, (85B) 2144, (86B) 2033. Engines despatched to other regions after repair include (30A) 64783, (32A) 64802, (32B) 64905, (33A) 42328, (33C) 42506, (35C) 40482, 44518, (36A) 64910/67, (37A) 64751, 64836, 64911, (38A) 64832, (40A) 64730, (71G) 44560, (84G) 43679, (87K) 42385. No. 58246 (LMS.3175) has come off works still with round-topped fire-box. The following withdrawn engines were cut up in February: 22853, 41012, 41962, 762, 41824, 43811; while Nos. 41011, 41955/60/3-5/8 and Crane 58865 were in the yard. Stored, near station: 40411/6, 40632, 41000/60, 43200/59, 43361/70, 43429. No. 43226 is in for special examination, and may be condemned. At the end of the month, Nos. 407, 40418 an 40513, which have been in store for some time near the station, were returned to traffic. |
SLS/195104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/05/1929 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2728 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1452 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
15/06/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
14/12/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Southend on Sea (?) | ||
12/04/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
19/04/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Southend on Sea (?) | ||
09/08/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
04/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1931. Dep: 17/10/1931. | ||
05/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1934. Dep: 22/03/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1919 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1936. Dep: 08/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8775 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/08/1936. Dep: 14/08/1936. | ||
17/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1939. Dep: 18/03/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8581 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/09/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
01/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1942. Dep: 05/06/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2697 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
22/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1945. Dep: 15/09/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8586 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4781 | ||
06/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1948. Dep: 13/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4941 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64781 |
||
27/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 27/01/1951. Dep: 22/03/1951. | ||
20/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
26/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
24/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
30/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
17/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1953. Dep: 02/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27663 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/09/1954. Dep: 24/09/1954. | ||
05/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1956. Dep: 08/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27880 (Diagram 97) Vacuum Ejector removed |
||
07/03/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64781 from Stratford (30A) | ||
04/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |