|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 11/02/1931 | 14/03/1931 | 32 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 05/03/1934 | 24/03/1934 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 2300 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/04/1937 | 01/05/1937 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 8024 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/12/1937 | 11/12/1937 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 03/02/1939 | 25/02/1939 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 8016 (Diagram 97) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/06/1941 | 18/08/1941 | 59 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 20/09/1942 | 03/10/1942 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 26/03/1944 | 06/05/1944 | 42 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 01/05/1947 | 03/03/1948 | 308 days | General | Boiler number 2303 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4773 |
||
Derby Works | 13/06/1951 | 20/07/1951 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64773 |
||
Derby Works | 09/10/1951 | 01/11/1951 | 24 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 29/12/1953 | 06/02/1954 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27821 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 22/10/1956 | 15/12/1956 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 27874 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 27/02/1958 | 30/05/1958 | 93 days | General | Not repaired |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1948 | Stratford Works | The following withdrawn locomotives (all marked 'Darlington') were in the fields behind the new Works: Nos. 5383, 7120/37, 7511/12; with the exception of No. 7137, the rest had gone on 3/4, presumably to Darlington. Nos. 5399, 5410/18, 7130/32 an 8213 (all withdrawn) which were formerly in the fields are now dumped on the road next to the stripping shop. Nos. 7131/35 were being cut up in the Paint Shop. The following W.D. 2-8-0's were newly painted and had been through shops recently:-Nos. 70867/874, 78580, 78605/675, 79205/233. By the type of lettering some appeared to have been dealt with in Belgium. Nos. 1530, 1639, 1766, 4773 an 9652 had been newly painted, prefixed 'E' and lettered 'British Railways,' while those noted renumbered (60000 added) were:-Nos. 1574, 7202, 9639 an 9659. | SLS/194805 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/05/1904 | Modification | Diagram 97 number 2186 boiler fitted | ||
06/05/1904 | Modification | Diagram 97 number 27707 boiler fitted | ||
06/12/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2720 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1434 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
14/12/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
25/01/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
11/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1931. Dep: 14/03/1931. | ||
05/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1934. Dep: 24/03/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2300 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (COL) | ||
13/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1937. Dep: 01/05/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8024 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/12/1937. Dep: 11/12/1937. | ||
03/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1939. Dep: 25/02/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8016 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/09/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
03/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (COL) | ||
21/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1941. Dep: 18/08/1941. | ||
20/07/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
03/08/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (COL) | ||
20/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/09/1942. Dep: 03/10/1942. | ||
26/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1944. Dep: 06/05/1944. | ||
19/01/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
22/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4773 | ||
01/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1947. Dep: 03/03/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2303 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4773 |
||
22/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) | ||
28/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) | ||
19/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
13/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/06/1951. Dep: 20/07/1951. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64773 |
||
12/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
18/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
09/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/10/1951. Dep: 01/11/1951. | ||
29/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1953. Dep: 06/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27821 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1956. Dep: 15/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27874 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1958. Dep: 30/05/1958. Work undertaken: Not repaired |
||
13/04/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
25/08/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64773 from Stratford (30A) | ||
09/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |