|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 17/10/1930 | 29/11/1930 | 44 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 27/10/1933 | 02/12/1933 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 8594 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1936 | 02/03/1936 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 2119 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/07/1938 | 20/08/1938 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 2214 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/02/1941 | 10/05/1941 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 2701 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/08/1944 | 14/10/1944 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 2194 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 26/11/1947 | 10/04/1948 | 137 days | General | Boiler number 2186 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64766 |
||
Derby Works | 04/02/1952 | 28/03/1952 | 54 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Stratford Works | 20/12/1954 | 29/01/1955 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27711 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 25/06/1957 | 16/08/1957 | 53 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 09/09/1957 | 21/09/1957 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 30/12/1957 | 01/02/1958 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 27678 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 28/04/1958 | 08/05/1958 | 11 days | Light Casual | Not repaired |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
12/02/1948 | Stratford Works | The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 | SLS/194803 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/11/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2713 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1427 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
03/12/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
17/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1930. Dep: 29/11/1930. | ||
27/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1933. Dep: 02/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8594 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1936. Dep: 02/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2119 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1938. Dep: 20/08/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2214 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1941. Dep: 10/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2701 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1944. Dep: 14/10/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2194 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4766 | ||
26/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1947. Dep: 10/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2186 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64766 |
||
15/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
21/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
18/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
24/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
04/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/02/1952. Dep: 28/03/1952. | ||
20/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1954. Dep: 29/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27711 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/06/1957. Dep: 16/08/1957. | ||
09/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/09/1957. Dep: 21/09/1957. | ||
30/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1957. Dep: 01/02/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27678 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/04/1958. Dep: 08/05/1958. Work undertaken: Not repaired |
||
28/09/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64766 from Stratford (30A) | ||
11/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |