|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 11/07/1930 | 30/08/1930 | 51 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 11/08/1933 | 15/09/1933 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2093 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/01/1936 | 12/02/1936 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 8007 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/02/1938 | 05/03/1938 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2182 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/05/1940 | 01/06/1940 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 2109 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1943 | 22/07/1943 | General | ||||
Gorton Works | 1944 | 21/10/1944 | General | Boiler number 1917 (Diagram 97) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1946 | 27/07/1946 | Light Repair | ||||
Gorton Works | 1947 | 29/11/1947 | General | Boiler number 8585 (Diagram 97) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1950 | 07/01/1950 | General | Boiler number 27596 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64758 |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 29/01/1953 | 18/04/1953 | 80 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/08/1953 | 05/09/1953 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/10/1953 | 1 day | Unclassified | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 27/12/1956 | 07/02/1957 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 27630 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/07/1962 | Darlington MPD (Awaiting Works) | Stored: 43070 (51L), 43101 (51L), 65768, 65772, 65773, 69002 (51A), 78015 (51J). Ex Works: 43014 (50A), 43125 (50B), 60834 (62B), 60944 (52B), 60973 (63A), 62004 (51A), 63389 (51L), 68043 (51A), 90011 (51A), 90273 (51L), 90430 (51A), 92098 (52H). Awaiting Works: 42639 (50F), 43134 (66D), 46494 (31A), 60818 (64A), 64706 (52G), 64713, 64730 (51L), 64757 (51L), 64758 (51L), 64821 (51L), 64835 (51F), 64848 (51F), 64982 (51F), 65670, 65761, 65776. Visitors : D12 (55H), 42553 (50A), 60040 (52A). | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/09/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2705 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1419 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
15/12/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
16/04/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
11/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1930. Dep: 30/08/1930. | ||
11/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1933. Dep: 15/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2093 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/05/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
04/12/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
03/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1936. Dep: 12/02/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8007 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1938. Dep: 05/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2182 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1940. Dep: 01/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2109 (Diagram 97) |
||
1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1943. Dep: 22/07/1943. | ||
1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1944. Dep: 21/10/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1917 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/06/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
02/05/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1946. Dep: 27/07/1946. | ||
01/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4758 | ||
1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1947. Dep: 29/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8585 (Diagram 97) |
||
1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1950. Dep: 07/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27596 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64758 |
||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
06/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
29/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/01/1953. Dep: 18/04/1953. | ||
04/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/08/1953. Dep: 05/09/1953. | ||
24/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/10/1953. | ||
27/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1956. Dep: 07/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27630 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
16/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64758 from Thornaby (51L) | ||
02/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |