|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 09/07/1930 | 30/08/1930 | 53 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/10/1933 | 28/10/1933 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 2138 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/01/1936 | 22/02/1936 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 2102 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/04/1937 | 21/05/1937 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 2205 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/05/1939 | 10/06/1939 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 2145 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/12/1940 | 18/01/1941 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 2095 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/04/1943 | 21/08/1943 | 134 days | General | Boiler number 2681 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/09/1943 | 18/09/1943 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 21/08/1944 | 16/09/1944 | 27 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 26/08/1945 | 03/11/1945 | 70 days | General | Boiler number 8774 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/07/1947 | 07/11/1947 | 104 days | General | Boiler number 8582 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/10/1949 | 03/12/1949 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 4980 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64757 |
||
Derby Works | 15/08/1950 | 19/10/1950 | 66 days | Light Casual | |||
Derby Works | 01/07/1952 | 18/08/1952 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 27712 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/06/1954 | 03/07/1954 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 06/07/1954 | 07/07/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 08/04/1955 | 14/05/1955 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27837 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1958 | 16/08/1958 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 25826 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
15/09/1950 | Derby Works | For works during first half of September: 40653 4B, 41050/9 14B, 41065 23C, 41118 8E, 42325 14B, 42533 33A, 43754 22B, 43959 18C, 43968 and M4010 21A, 44164 an 44402 17A, 44174 17D, 7588 5C, 7635 22B, 58137 16C, 64883 40A, 40410 35C, 41062 19B, 41068 20A, 1251 (58034) 22B, 42339 16A, 42344 5D, 42345 5C, 43246 an 43435 21A, 43344 22B, 3650 18A, 43819 18A, 43925 20D, 44180 17C, 44355 22A, 7481 87K, 22945 (58136) 20B, 58237 20C, 64757 38A, 64959 32A, 40001 11A, 40351 20A, 426 17A, 41001 22B, 41004 20E, 41006 15C, 41067 20E, 41095 15C, 41154 9E, 1429 (58090) 20C, 42364 5D, 42509 33C, 42512 33C, 3456 20A, 3914 18D, 44598 16A, 47548 19A, 58209 19B, 64798 38E. New Construction: No. 42050 was ex Paint Shop on 6/9, and others up to 42057 were in various stages in the Erecting Shop. Diesels 12074/5 were completed and others up to 12079 in course of construction. No. 42146 was on trials on 6/9. Nos. 404, 40411/6 have gone into traffic ex store, but Nos. 407, 40513, 43342/64, 43482 are in store, near the station. Withdrawn: still in works Yard: 40498, 40515, 41017, 43297, 43818, 22853 (58112), 3511 (58275), 1251 (58034) and 1406 (58079). No. 41748 is ex Works, with round-top firebox. No. 58080 (0-4-4T) has appeared fully lined, with emblem. Among those repainted black with emblem are 2108 (0-6-OPT), and J.39 Nos. 64762/5/84/97, 64903/62/9, while 64906/51 still retain BRITISH RAILWAYS (not repainted). |
SLS/195012 |
21/10/1950 | Derby Works | For Works: W/E 21/10/50, 40405 5C, 40505 71H, 40522 8E, 40743 20A, 41123 7A, 42184 16A, 42332 9B, 42374 33A, 42521 33D, 43212 18C, 44166 17B, 4267 22A, 44524 21A, 7096 1A, 7441 15C, 47469 23C, 20155 16A, 23006 3E, 58247 17C, (W) 2107 84F, 64834 32B, 64958 30A. The most interesting items are 40743 for intermediate repair, and 20155 (the last 2-4-0-Midland-for special examination which usually means condemnation). New construction: 42054 on trials 18/10, 42055/6 completed, 42057-60 in various stages; 12078 in paint shop 18/10, 12079-81 complete, 12082-4 in various stages. Ex works 40532/655, 41004/67, 42509/22, 42325, 47410, 64721/37/57, 64956/80 (W/E 18/10), 40584, 41001/60, 41153/65/81, 41833, 42345, 43586, 43992, 47340, 47674, 64883 (W/E 25/10). Cut up: 15-18/10/50. Nos. 1251 an 1406 (old Nos.). No. 58236, in paint shop 18/10 with R/T boiler. Stored: 407, 40418/513/556/632, 43342/64, 3368, 43482, 43200. (25/10). |
SLS/195012 |
14/07/1962 | Darlington MPD (Awaiting Works) | Stored: 43070 (51L), 43101 (51L), 65768, 65772, 65773, 69002 (51A), 78015 (51J). Ex Works: 43014 (50A), 43125 (50B), 60834 (62B), 60944 (52B), 60973 (63A), 62004 (51A), 63389 (51L), 68043 (51A), 90011 (51A), 90273 (51L), 90430 (51A), 92098 (52H). Awaiting Works: 42639 (50F), 43134 (66D), 46494 (31A), 60818 (64A), 64706 (52G), 64713, 64730 (51L), 64757 (51L), 64758 (51L), 64821 (51L), 64835 (51F), 64848 (51F), 64982 (51F), 65670, 65761, 65776. Visitors : D12 (55H), 42553 (50A), 60040 (52A). | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/09/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2704 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1418 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
10/07/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
21/09/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
09/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1930. Dep: 30/08/1930. | ||
20/09/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
03/10/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
13/03/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
04/04/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
16/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1933. Dep: 28/10/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2138 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1936. Dep: 22/02/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2102 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1937. Dep: 21/05/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2205 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1939. Dep: 10/06/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2145 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1940. Dep: 18/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2095 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1943. Dep: 21/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2681 (Diagram 97) |
||
10/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/09/1943. Dep: 18/09/1943. | ||
21/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1944. Dep: 16/09/1944. | ||
26/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1945. Dep: 03/11/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8774 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4757 | ||
30/03/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
27/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1947. Dep: 07/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8582 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1949. Dep: 03/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4980 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64757 |
||
15/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/08/1950. Dep: 19/10/1950. | ||
20/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
26/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
01/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1952. Dep: 18/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27712 (Diagram 97) |
||
01/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/06/1954. Dep: 03/07/1954. | ||
06/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/07/1954. Dep: 07/07/1954. | ||
08/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1955. Dep: 14/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27837 (Diagram 97) |
||
25/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1958. Dep: 16/08/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 25826 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
26/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64757 from Thornaby (51L) | ||
03/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |