|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 22/06/1929 | 19/07/1929 | 28 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/10/1931 | 21/11/1931 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 8017 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/02/1934 | 16/03/1934 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 1931 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1936 | 06/05/1936 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 2302 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/12/1937 | 15/01/1938 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 2114 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/02/1940 | 06/04/1940 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 8025 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 30/08/1942 | 24/10/1942 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 8026 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/03/1944 | 07/04/1944 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 04/10/1944 | 25/11/1944 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 2112 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/04/1946 | 07/06/1946 | 58 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4734 |
||
Gorton Works | 27/04/1947 | 13/10/1947 | 170 days | General | Boiler number 2683 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/10/1948 | 11/12/1948 | 46 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 64734 |
||
Gorton Works | 26/08/1949 | 17/09/1949 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Derby Works | 24/11/1950 | 15/01/1951 | 53 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Derby Works | 06/07/1952 | 09/09/1952 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 27717 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 09/09/1954 | 18/09/1954 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 16/06/1955 | 05/08/1955 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 27842 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/01/1958 | 22/02/1958 | 45 days | Light Casual | Not repaired |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1950 | Derby Works | In addition to the normal types of L.M.S. origin, the following have come off works: 2060, 2107, 12011, 64749/82, 64807/34, 64958/9. Withdrawn engines in works yard: 3802, 20155, 22853, 58061. No. 20155 has had the number freshly painted on the smokebox door, and neatly enclosed in a white-painted rectangle. Buffer beam repainted, but boiler casing removed. Engines in for repair 2053 (82D), 12012 (8C), 12002 (5B), 64841 (32B), 64893 (36A), 64971 (40A), 64727 (9F), (6)4910 (36A), 64734 (40A), 64793 (32B), 64805 (39A), 42387/8 (87K); 7316 (71G); and the following other un-renumbered engines 7583 (26B), 2995 (18B), 524 (7B), 4294 (18A), 7131 (21A), 7298 (4A), 7300 (33A), 32 (14B); also numerous others of L.M.S. origin. Position as regards new construction on 30/11/50:-42062/3 almost complete; 42064/5 commenced; 12084/5 in paint shop, 12086 completed. Early in December another diesel, 12087 had the engines mounted, and the frames of 73000 were in the erecting shop. Among engines entering works were 509 (71G), 2988 (15B), 3827 (18A), 7503 (11C), 64802 (32A), 64979 (37A). Nos. 509, 43319 an 3827 were 'for special examination' and may not survive the ordeal. |
SLS/195101 |
13/01/1951 | Derby Works | During the period ended 13/1/51, the following unrenumbered engines have appeared for Works: for special examination, 1377 (19B) and 530 (22B); for attention, 7236 (19A), 7502 (18D), 3392 (20B), 22944 (16A), 7165 (28B), 7572 (25A), 3679 (84G). Cut up, 20155 (14/12). New 2-6-4T on trial, 42065 . 10000, 10001 an 10800 were receiving attention in the diesel shop. Apart from the usual Derby types, the following were in evidence: 64714 (39A), 64730 (40A), 64832 (38A), 64967 (37A), 2043 (LYD), 64783 (30A), 64836 (37A), also the following 'outsiders'-42502 (33C), 42509/29/30 (33A), 43757 (84G), 47479 (87K), 40482 an 43957 (35C), 41824 (87K), 42506 (33A), 42385 (87K). The following came off still lettered 'British Railways'-42388, 64727, 41853 (round-top firebox), 47576, 42342, 41905 (lined); and others still 'L.M.S.' !! 41534, 44186, 41196, 42533, 40032, 47503, 44339, 40928, 42387, 42530, 43627, 44103 (after three years of British Railways). No. 10100 was on trial on 9/1/51, when 10000/1 were still in the diesel shop. The following are stored near the station: 407, 40418, 40513, 40632, 43200/59, 43361, 43429. Old engines fresh off works include 2053 and 2112 (0-6-0PT), 40454, 40463, 43627, 43790, 58062, 58159, 58162. Those repainted with emblem include 64734, 64805/41/93 an 43846 with a L.M.S. standard 0-8-0 tender. | SLS/195102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/06/1927 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1275 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1369 Allocated to Immingham (IMM) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
19/06/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
22/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1929. Dep: 19/07/1929. | ||
28/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1931. Dep: 21/11/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8017 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1934. Dep: 16/03/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1931 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/02/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
09/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1936. Dep: 06/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2302 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/05/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
14/06/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
20/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1937. Dep: 15/01/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2114 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/09/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
30/11/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
18/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1940. Dep: 06/04/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8025 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
30/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1942. Dep: 24/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8026 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/03/1944. Dep: 07/04/1944. | ||
04/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1944. Dep: 25/11/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2112 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/09/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
11/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1946. Dep: 07/06/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4734 |
||
22/12/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
27/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1947. Dep: 13/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2683 (Diagram 97) |
||
27/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/10/1948. Dep: 11/12/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64734 |
||
26/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/08/1949. Dep: 17/09/1949. | ||
24/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 24/11/1950. Dep: 15/01/1951. | ||
06/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1952. Dep: 09/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27717 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/12/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) | ||
14/02/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
09/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/09/1954. Dep: 18/09/1954. | ||
16/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1955. Dep: 05/08/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27842 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/01/1958. Dep: 22/02/1958. Work undertaken: Not repaired |
||
18/05/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64734 from Lincoln (40A) | ||
09/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |