|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 29/06/1929 | 03/08/1929 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/02/1932 | 05/03/1932 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 2123 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/11/1934 | 24/11/1934 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 2284 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/09/1937 | 09/10/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 2103 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/06/1940 | 29/06/1940 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 2666 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 28/07/1942 | 22/08/1942 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 2210 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 27/01/1944 | 18/03/1944 | 52 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/03/1945 | 21/04/1945 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2103 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/10/1948 | 30/10/1948 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 4943 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64727 |
||
Derby Works | 22/11/1950 | 28/12/1950 | 37 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/10/1951 | 10/11/1951 | 13 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 30/11/1953 | 19/12/1953 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 27455 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 19/08/1955 | 10/09/1955 | 23 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/09/1955 | 17/09/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 31/07/1956 | 01/08/1956 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/08/1957 | 04/09/1957 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 27558 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/05/1959 | 29/05/1959 | 22 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/01/1961 | 04/03/1961 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 27572 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 21/02/1962 | 22/02/1962 | 2 days | Unclassified | Boiler only |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1950 | Derby Works | In addition to the normal types of L.M.S. origin, the following have come off works: 2060, 2107, 12011, 64749/82, 64807/34, 64958/9. Withdrawn engines in works yard: 3802, 20155, 22853, 58061. No. 20155 has had the number freshly painted on the smokebox door, and neatly enclosed in a white-painted rectangle. Buffer beam repainted, but boiler casing removed. Engines in for repair 2053 (82D), 12012 (8C), 12002 (5B), 64841 (32B), 64893 (36A), 64971 (40A), 64727 (9F), (6)4910 (36A), 64734 (40A), 64793 (32B), 64805 (39A), 42387/8 (87K); 7316 (71G); and the following other un-renumbered engines 7583 (26B), 2995 (18B), 524 (7B), 4294 (18A), 7131 (21A), 7298 (4A), 7300 (33A), 32 (14B); also numerous others of L.M.S. origin. Position as regards new construction on 30/11/50:-42062/3 almost complete; 42064/5 commenced; 12084/5 in paint shop, 12086 completed. Early in December another diesel, 12087 had the engines mounted, and the frames of 73000 were in the erecting shop. Among engines entering works were 509 (71G), 2988 (15B), 3827 (18A), 7503 (11C), 64802 (32A), 64979 (37A). Nos. 509, 43319 an 3827 were 'for special examination' and may not survive the ordeal. |
SLS/195101 |
13/01/1951 | Derby Works | During the period ended 13/1/51, the following unrenumbered engines have appeared for Works: for special examination, 1377 (19B) and 530 (22B); for attention, 7236 (19A), 7502 (18D), 3392 (20B), 22944 (16A), 7165 (28B), 7572 (25A), 3679 (84G). Cut up, 20155 (14/12). New 2-6-4T on trial, 42065 . 10000, 10001 an 10800 were receiving attention in the diesel shop. Apart from the usual Derby types, the following were in evidence: 64714 (39A), 64730 (40A), 64832 (38A), 64967 (37A), 2043 (LYD), 64783 (30A), 64836 (37A), also the following 'outsiders'-42502 (33C), 42509/29/30 (33A), 43757 (84G), 47479 (87K), 40482 an 43957 (35C), 41824 (87K), 42506 (33A), 42385 (87K). The following came off still lettered 'British Railways'-42388, 64727, 41853 (round-top firebox), 47576, 42342, 41905 (lined); and others still 'L.M.S.' !! 41534, 44186, 41196, 42533, 40032, 47503, 44339, 40928, 42387, 42530, 43627, 44103 (after three years of British Railways). No. 10100 was on trial on 9/1/51, when 10000/1 were still in the diesel shop. The following are stored near the station: 407, 40418, 40513, 40632, 43200/59, 43361, 43429. Old engines fresh off works include 2053 and 2112 (0-6-0PT), 40454, 40463, 43627, 43790, 58062, 58159, 58162. Those repainted with emblem include 64734, 64805/41/93 an 43846 with a L.M.S. standard 0-8-0 tender. | SLS/195102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/05/1927 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1267 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1362 Allocated to Immingham (IMM) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
14/10/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
29/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1929. Dep: 03/08/1929. | ||
13/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1932. Dep: 05/03/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2123 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1934. Dep: 24/11/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2284 (Diagram 97) |
||
18/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1937. Dep: 09/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2103 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
15/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1940. Dep: 29/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2666 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
28/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1942. Dep: 22/08/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2210 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
27/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1944. Dep: 18/03/1944. | ||
17/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1945. Dep: 21/04/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2103 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/01/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
06/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4727 | ||
08/06/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
25/09/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
02/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1948. Dep: 30/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4943 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64727 |
||
16/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
18/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
22/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/11/1950. Dep: 28/12/1950. | ||
07/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12B) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12B) | ||
29/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 29/10/1951. Dep: 10/11/1951. | ||
30/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1953. Dep: 19/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27455 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/08/1955. Dep: 10/09/1955. | ||
16/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1955. Dep: 17/09/1955. | ||
31/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/07/1956. Dep: 01/08/1956. | ||
12/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1957. Dep: 04/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27558 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (9G) | ||
08/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 08/05/1959. Dep: 29/05/1959. | ||
14/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1961. Dep: 04/03/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27572 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/02/1962. Dep: 22/02/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler only |
||
19/04/1962 | Modification | Diagram 97 number 27594 boiler fitted | ||
30/07/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
27/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64727 from Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
09/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |