|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 08/03/1928 | 16/05/1928 | 70 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 12/12/1929 | 07/02/1930 | 58 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/11/1932 | 09/12/1932 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2340 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/10/1934 | 24/11/1934 | 30 days | General | Tender only |
||
Darlington Works | 17/09/1936 | 29/10/1936 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2143 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 31/05/1939 | 04/09/1939 | 97 days | General | Boiler number 8014 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/02/1940 | 19/03/1940 | 28 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1940 | 02/07/1940 | 44 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 12/10/1942 | 06/11/1942 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 2141 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 01/02/1945 | 24/02/1945 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2717 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/03/1946 | 18/04/1946 | 29 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4711 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/06/1947 | 23/08/1947 | 65 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/10/1949 | 12/11/1949 | 39 days | Light Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64711 |
||
Darlington Works | 12/09/1950 | 15/09/1950 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/04/1952 | 10/05/1952 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 27523 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 12/08/1955 | 03/09/1955 | 23 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/04/1957 | 11/05/1957 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 27632 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/08/1947 | Cowlairs Works | On 24/8 the following withdrawn locos. were in the Works yard: 'Dl' 2212, 'D29' 2415 and 'D31' 2068, the last two having been stripped; whilst those seen here newly painted were: 'D29' 2411 (green), 'J37' 4617 and 'J39' 4704. Locos. awaiting works, some of which had been stripped were: 'J39' 4711, 4817/40/49/65, 4919/22/28/42; 'K2' 1732/46/51/68/91; 'K3' 1879; 'D1' 2216; 'Dll' 2691; 'J38' 5909; 'J36' 5223/61; 'J35' 4503; 'J37' 4546/48/65/67, 4607/15; 'D31' 2059; 'D34' 2489; 'C15' 7453/65/66, 'N14' 9121; 'N15' 9191, 9214. The Erecting Shop was full and included: 'K2' 1720/34/52; 'K3' 1855; 'J39' 4912/16; 'J38' 5901/12; 'Dll' 2684/87 and 'Y9' 8120/22. | SLS/194710 |
24/08/1947 | Eastfield MPD | On 24/8 the locos. on shed ex works were 'J39' 4923/33; 'J83' 8445 and 'J69' 8623, and further locos. ex works during August that have been noted here are: 'K2' 1757; 'J37' 4541/79/84, 4604/17/21; 'J39' 4711, 4818, 4929; 'C15' 7468; 'J88' 8345; 'J83' 8473 (green); 'N15' 9136/77 an 9222. | SLS/194710 |
31/10/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 61219, 61779/81, 61855, 1900, 62432/78, 2484, 3071, 3134/47/75/84, 4565, 64578, 4639, 4711/92, 4816, 64849, 4927, 65929/31, 7484/95, 8332/48, 68456, 69130, 9165, 69199, 9216, 69514, 9562, 77119, 79265. | SLS/194912 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
17/11/1926 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1481 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1346 Allocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
08/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1928. Dep: 16/05/1928. | ||
12/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1929. Dep: 07/02/1930. | ||
01/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1932. Dep: 09/12/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2340 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1934. Dep: 24/11/1934. Work undertaken: Tender only |
||
17/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1936. Dep: 29/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2143 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
31/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1939. Dep: 04/09/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8014 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/02/1940. Dep: 19/03/1940. | ||
20/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/05/1940. Dep: 02/07/1940. | ||
12/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1942. Dep: 06/11/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2141 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
03/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
01/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1945. Dep: 24/02/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2717 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/03/1946. Dep: 18/04/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4711 |
||
20/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1947. Dep: 23/08/1947. | ||
28/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD) | ||
05/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 05/10/1949. Dep: 12/11/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64711 |
||
12/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/09/1950. Dep: 15/09/1950. | ||
18/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1952. Dep: 10/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27523 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 12/08/1955. Dep: 03/09/1955. | ||
16/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1957. Dep: 11/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27632 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/05/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64711 from Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
10/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |