|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 06/02/1930 | 28/03/1930 | 51 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 10/12/1931 | 20/01/1932 | 42 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 26/01/1934 | 17/02/1934 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 2214 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/10/1935 | 12/12/1935 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 2121 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 11/03/1938 | 14/05/1938 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 2312 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/01/1941 | 22/02/1941 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2296 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 22/05/1943 | 19/06/1943 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 22/01/1944 | 04/03/1944 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2184 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 08/03/1947 | 13/06/1947 | 98 days | General | Boiler number 2704 (Diagram 97) |
||
Derby Works | 02/08/1951 | 19/09/1951 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 27675 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64708 |
||
Stratford Works | 27/07/1954 | 04/09/1954 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27891 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 15/01/1958 | 01/03/1958 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 27846 (Diagram 97) |
||
Stratford Works | 29/12/1959 | 22/01/1960 | 25 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
25/09/1947 | Stratford Works | The following withdrawn locos. were noted in the vicinity of the stripping shop on 25/9: 'F3' 7118/21/29/38/45; 'B12/3' 1522; 'D16/3' 2500; 'J15' 5358 an 5403 (all stripped), whilst 7125 an 7148 were intact. Other locos. stripped were: 'J15' 5402/54; 'D16' 2535; 'J17' 5541/71. In the stripping shop were: 'E4' 2784; 'J15' 5472; 'J19/2' 4675 and 'J17' 5549. In the Paint shop were the 'Coffee Pot' 'Y5' 8081 and W.D. 77416. A curious sight was the crane tank shed filled by two W.D.'s 77119 an 77312 (the latter with a 15A shed plate). In the fields behind the New Works were 'F3' 7146; 'J70' 8225; 'H2' 7512; 'D16' 2591; 'B12' 1544 and 'J39' 4841, all awaiting works. W.D. 77476 was in the New Works, and W.D.'s 77302 and 77107 were in the shed yard. 'D16' 2584; 'J20' 4677/93; 'J39' 4708/61, 'J69' 8574/8632; 'F6' 7230 and 'F4' 7162 were all noted newly painted ex-works. 7162 was fitted with a tablet-catcher. | SLS/194711 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/11/1926 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1457 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1343 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
06/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1930. Dep: 28/03/1930. | ||
10/12/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1931. Dep: 20/01/1932. | ||
26/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1934. Dep: 17/02/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2214 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/07/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
28/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1935. Dep: 12/12/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2121 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
12/11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
11/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1938. Dep: 14/05/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2312 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1941. Dep: 22/02/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2296 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/05/1943. Dep: 19/06/1943. | ||
22/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1944. Dep: 04/03/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2184 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4708 | ||
08/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1947. Dep: 13/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2704 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) | ||
16/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) | ||
22/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
28/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
02/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1951. Dep: 19/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27675 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64708 |
||
27/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1954. Dep: 04/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27891 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1958. Dep: 01/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27846 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/12/1959. Dep: 22/01/1960. | ||
08/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
18/08/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64708 from Stratford (30A) |