|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 08/04/1929 | 28/05/1929 | 51 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 31/08/1931 | 13/10/1931 | 44 days | General | Steam Brakes fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 22/08/1933 | 29/09/1933 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2306 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/06/1935 | 15/08/1935 | 59 days | General | Screw Reverse fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 09/04/1937 | 07/05/1937 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1907 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/03/1939 | 10/05/1939 | 48 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 26/05/1941 | 01/07/1941 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 2710 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/03/1943 | 1 day | W | ||||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1943 | 05/07/1943 | 33 days | Heavy | Boiler number 2253 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/07/1943 | 14/07/1943 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/04/1945 | 26/05/1945 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2713 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/06/1947 | 18/06/1947 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/11/1947 | 25/01/1947 | -287 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/04/1948 | 15/05/1948 | 37 days | General | Renumbered to BR 64707 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/05/1951 | 23/06/1951 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27585 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gateshead Works | 21/08/1951 | 24/08/1951 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/09/1953 | 09/10/1953 | 30 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 30/10/1956 | 01/12/1956 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 27563 (Diagram 97) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/10/1926 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1456 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1342 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
08/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1929. Dep: 28/05/1929. | ||
31/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1931. Dep: 13/10/1931. Work undertaken: Steam Brakes fitted |
||
22/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1933. Dep: 29/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2306 (Diagram 97) |
||
16/07/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
18/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1935. Dep: 15/08/1935. Work undertaken: Screw Reverse fitted |
||
09/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1937. Dep: 07/05/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1907 (Diagram 97) |
||
24/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1939. Dep: 10/05/1939. | ||
26/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1941. Dep: 01/07/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2710 (Diagram 97) |
||
08/03/1943 | Works Visit | |||
03/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 03/06/1943. Dep: 05/07/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2253 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/07/1943. Dep: 14/07/1943. | ||
03/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
28/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1945. Dep: 26/05/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2713 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4707 | ||
04/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/06/1947. Dep: 18/06/1947. | ||
09/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/11/1947. Dep: 25/01/1947. | ||
09/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1948. Dep: 15/05/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64707 |
||
18/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
24/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
24/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1951. Dep: 23/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27585 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/08/1951. Dep: 24/08/1951. | ||
04/01/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
10/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 10/09/1953. Dep: 09/10/1953. | ||
30/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1956. Dep: 01/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27563 (Diagram 97) |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
13/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
25/08/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64707 from Sunderland (52G) | ||
09/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |