|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 02/02/1930 | 19/03/1930 | 46 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/10/1932 | 22/11/1932 | 41 days | General | Steam Brakes fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 09/05/1934 | 05/07/1934 | 58 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 18/07/1934 | 21/07/1934 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/02/1935 | 20/03/1935 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 1902 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/03/1937 | 27/04/1937 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2099 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 04/05/1939 | 17/06/1939 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 2710 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/04/1941 | 23/05/1941 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 2143 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 21/03/1944 | 20/04/1944 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 1907 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 02/06/1945 | 16/06/1945 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/01/1946 | 02/03/1946 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 27455 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 12/03/1946 | 16/03/1946 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/07/1946 | 27/07/1946 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/11/1946 | 30/11/1946 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/04/1948 | 05/06/1948 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 2663 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64701 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 27/09/1950 | 27/10/1950 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/02/1954 | 27/02/1954 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 2714 (Diagram 97) |
||
Gateshead Works | 11/10/1954 | 17/12/1954 | 68 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/06/1958 | 12/07/1958 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 27555 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 17/02/1959 | 24/03/1959 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/05/1960 | 14/06/1960 | 43 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/01/1962 | 20/02/1962 | 33 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/10/1926 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1449 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1336 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
02/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1930. Dep: 19/03/1930. | ||
07/04/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
13/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1932. Dep: 22/11/1932. Work undertaken: Steam Brakes fitted |
||
09/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/05/1934. Dep: 05/07/1934. | ||
18/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/07/1934. Dep: 21/07/1934. | ||
14/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1935. Dep: 20/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1902 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
27/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1937. Dep: 27/04/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2099 (Diagram 97) Screw Reverse fitted |
||
04/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1939. Dep: 17/06/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2710 (Diagram 97) |
||
21/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1941. Dep: 23/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2143 (Diagram 97) |
||
23/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
16/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
21/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1944. Dep: 20/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1907 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/06/1945. Dep: 16/06/1945. | ||
26/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1946. Dep: 02/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27455 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/03/1946. Dep: 16/03/1946. | ||
06/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/07/1946. Dep: 27/07/1946. | ||
03/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4701 | ||
20/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/11/1946. Dep: 30/11/1946. | ||
07/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1948. Dep: 05/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2663 (Diagram 97) Renumbered to BR 64701 |
||
18/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
24/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
27/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/09/1950. Dep: 27/10/1950. | ||
01/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1954. Dep: 27/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2714 (Diagram 97) |
||
11/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/10/1954. Dep: 17/12/1954. | ||
07/07/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
24/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1958. Dep: 12/07/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27555 (Diagram 97) |
||
17/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/02/1959. Dep: 24/03/1959. | ||
13/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
03/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/05/1960. Dep: 14/06/1960. | ||
19/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/01/1962. Dep: 20/02/1962. | ||
16/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64701 from Sunderland (52G) | ||
02/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |