Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 127 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17930 Week
» 70946 Month
» 190473 Year
» 3217326 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
1410 |
on |
15/02/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5909 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
65909 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J38 |
Company History |
LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1309 |
To Service |
Sat 15/02/1926 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 19/11/1966 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 9 mths , 4 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1945 |
Screw Reverse fitted |
04/1945 |
Steam Reverse Removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
24/08/1947 |
Cowlairs Works |
On 24/8 the following withdrawn locos. were in the Works yard: 'Dl' 2212, 'D29' 2415 and 'D31' 2068, the last two having been stripped; whilst those seen here newly painted were: 'D29' 2411 (green), 'J37' 4617 and 'J39' 4704. Locos. awaiting works, some of which had been stripped were: 'J39' 4711, 4817/40/49/65, 4919/22/28/42; 'K2' 1732/46/51/68/91; 'K3' 1879; 'D1' 2216; 'Dll' 2691; 'J38' 5909; 'J36' 5223/61; 'J35' 4503; 'J37' 4546/48/65/67, 4607/15; 'D31' 2059; 'D34' 2489; 'C15' 7453/65/66, 'N14' 9121; 'N15' 9191, 9214. The Erecting Shop was full and included: 'K2' 1720/34/52; 'K3' 1855; 'J39' 4912/16; 'J38' 5901/12; 'Dll' 2684/87 and 'Y9' 8120/22. |
SLS/194710 |
07/09/1947 |
Eastfield MPD |
Nos. 4852 an 4927 (both BLA) were observed here on 7/9, awaiting shops. Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during September are: Nos. *1734/*1782, 1855, 2476/89, *2684/*2687, 2702, 4548, 4636, 4840/49, 4916/19/23/28, 5901/8/9/12, 7453/66, 7600, 8122, 8328, 8468/80, 9133, 9214/16 an 9564, whilst those observed on 1/10 were: *1732, 2455/73, 4578, 4865, 4922 an 9160 . *Painted green. On 11/10 'J83' No. 8474 was on shed, being ex Works and painted green. This engine now has a Gresham and Craven type 'P' solid jet ejector and an old (trigger) pattern steam brake valve. 'J37' No. 4546 has L.M.S. type water gauge frames with Dewrance protectors. |
SLS/194711 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/02/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1410 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1309 |
|
|
04/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Screw Reverse fitted |
|
|
04/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Reverse Removed |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5909 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU) |
|
|
21/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmont (POL) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65909 |
|
|
30/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
22/08/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
19/11/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65909 |
|
|
04/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick |
|
|