Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 1021 Today
» 1303 Yesterday
» 2324 Week
» 19640 Month
» 278499 Year
» 789601 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NBR 518   10/1921
LNER (1924) 9518   10/1924
LNER (1946) 4639   05/1946
BR 64639   10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Reid
Class J37
Company History NBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J3710/1921
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Cowlairs Works
To Service During 10/1921
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off Eastfield (65A)
Scrapping During 02/1964 at Barnes and Bell (Coatbridge)
Service Life 41 yrs, 2 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EFD Eastfield 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC EFD Eastfield 9w/e 31/03/1946
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 5w/e 10/03/1962
WDN   29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1921 To Service To service as NBR Number 518
Built at Cowlairs Works
   
10/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 9518    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4639    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64639    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 64639 from Eastfield (65A)    
02/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Barnes and Bell: Coatbridge    

prev